Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00013
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 5:06 AM CST
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff
Daniel E. Mathis
Represented By
Kevin Reeve Duck
Duck Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Renita Mathis
Represented By
Kevin Reeve Duck
Duck Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2025. Discovery due by 11/24/2025. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 12/29/2025. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 1/26/2026. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/26/2026. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/2/2026. Discovery from Experts due by 4/13/2026. Motions shall be filed by 5/18/2026. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2026. Pretrial Conference before the District Judge set for 9/21/2026 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/5/2026. A Request for a Settlement Conference shall be made by 6/18/2026. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 10/19/2026. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/16/2026. 3-day Jury Trial set for 11/30/2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/05/2025. (CIS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Tue 04/15 3:59 PM
Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2025 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 misc Status Report Thu 04/10 3:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Daniel E. Mathis, Kayla Renita Mathis. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 3:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors, LLC.. (Crochet, Quincy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 03/05 3:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by General Motors, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person BlackRock, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors Company, Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors Holdings LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Kayla Renita Mathis, Affiliate/Interested Person Daniel E. Mathis for General Motors, LLC.. (Crochet, Quincy)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/05 2:56 PM
General Motors LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC.(Crochet, Quincy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/13 9:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Renita Mathis, Daniel E. Mathis. General Motors, LLC served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 order 90 Day Conference Order Wed 02/12 1:20 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/12/2025. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/07 10:50 AM
Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (CIS)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 01/07 10:40 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Kayla Renita Mathis, Daniel E. Mathis. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Complete Case Opening First) Tue 01/07 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2848862.), filed by Kayla Renita Mathis, Daniel E. Mathis.(Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons