Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-10006

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:25-ap-50000
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 1:26 PM EST
Defendant
Inmarsat Global Limited
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Inmarsat Global Limited
contact info
Interested Party
OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC
5955 DE SOTO AVE STE 100
WOODLAND HILLS, CA 91367
Plaintiff
Ligado Networks LLC
10802 Parkridge Boulevard
Reston, VA 20191
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Emily Rae Mathews
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Michael Joseph Merchant
Richards Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
John M. Conlon
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc.
10802 Parkridge Boulevard
Reston, VA 20191
Represented By
Emily Rae Mathews
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Reginald R. Goeke
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Joaquin M C de Baca
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Michael Joseph Merchant
Richards Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Maura A. McKeon
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
35 35 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/27 11:31 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 24, 2025 at 11:00 A.M. (ET), Before the Honorable Thomas M. Horan, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, 3rd Floor, Courtroom 7 [Docket No. 344; Adv. Docket No. 33] . Filed by OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 33
34 34 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/27 4:18 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice [Adv. Docket No. 31] and Status Report Regarding Debtors Complaint Against Inmarsat Regarding the Cooperation Agreement [Adv. Docket No. 32] . Filed by OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 31 ,32
Thursday, March 20, 2025
33 33 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 03/20 11:48 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/20 11:47 AM
Adversary Case 1:25-ap-50000 Closed (IJW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Wed 03/19 4:58 PM
Status Report Regarding Debtors' Complaint Against Inmarsat Regarding the Cooperation Agreement Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 03/19 4:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal (Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice) Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
30 30 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/13 11:39 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 11, 2025 at 10:00 A.M. (ET), Before the Honorable Thomas M. Horan, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, 3rd Floor, Courtroom 7 [Docket No. 321; Adv. Docket No. 28] . Filed by OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 28
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
29 29 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 03/12 10:59 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 11, 2025 at 10:00 A.M. (ET), Before the Honorable Thomas M. Horan, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, 3rd Floor, Courtroom 7 [Docket No. 319; Adv. Docket No. 27] . Filed by OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 27
Monday, March 10, 2025
28 28 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 03/10 12:11 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
27 27 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 03/07 11:55 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
26 26 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
[SEALED] Declaration of Charles Michael in Support of Defendant Inmarsat Global Limited's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Inmarsat Global Limited. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-] 24 ,25
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Exhibit 16
Att: 17 Exhibit 17
Att: 18 Exhibit 18
Att: 19 Exhibit 19
Att: 20 Exhibit 20
Att: 21 Exhibit 21
Att: 22 Exhibit 22
Att: 23 Exhibit 23
Att: 24 Exhibit 24
Att: 25 Exhibit 25
Att: 26 Exhibit 26
Att: 27 Exhibit 27
Att: 28 Exhibit 28
Att: 29 Exhibit 29
Att: 30 Exhibit 30
Att: 31 Exhibit 31
Att: 32 Exhibit 32
Att: 33 Exhibit 33
Att: 34 Exhibit 34
Att: 35 Exhibit 35
Att: 36 Exhibit 36
Att: 37 Exhibit 37
Att: 38 Exhibit 38
Att: 39 Exhibit 39
Att: 40 Exhibit 40
Att: 41 Exhibit 41
Att: 42 Exhibit 42
Att: 43 Exhibit 43
Att: 44 Exhibit 44
Att: 45 Exhibit 45
Att: 46 Exhibit 46
Att: 47 Exhibit 47
Att: 48 Exhibit 48
Att: 49 Exhibit 49
Att: 50 Exhibit 50
Att: 51 Exhibit 51
Att: 52 Exhibit 52
Att: 53 Exhibit 53
25 25 39 pgs misc Brief Thu 02/27 1:38 PM
Brief // Inmarsat Global Limited's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Inmarsat Global Limited. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-] 24
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
24 24 2 pgs motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion Thu 02/27 1:36 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Inmarsat Global Limited. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 24, 2025
23 23 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 02/24 11:52 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Granting Inmarsat an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond and Scheduling Related Deadlines [Adv. Docket No. 15] and Order Approving Stipulation Granting Inmarsat an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond and Scheduling Related Deadlines [Adv. Docket No. 16] . Filed by OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 15 ,16
Friday, February 21, 2025
22 22 notice Withdrawal - Notice Fri 02/21 3:18 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Service Related [+] Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-] 17
21 21 notice Withdrawal - Notice Fri 02/21 1:35 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of (I) Notice of Service of Discovery and (II) Inmarsat Global Limited's Notice of Deposition of Douglas Smith Related [+] Filed by Inmarsat Global Limited (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-] 18 ,19
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
20 20 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 02/19 11:53 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Correcting Adversary Proceeding Case Caption [Adv. Docket No. 13] and Order Correcting Adversary Proceeding Case Caption [Adv. Docket No. 14] . Filed by OMNI AGENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 13 ,14
19 19 notice Deposition - Notice Wed 02/19 2:39 PM
Notice of Deposition // Inmarsat Global Limited's Notice of Deposition of Douglas Smith Filed by Inmarsat Global Limited (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Service Wed 02/19 2:36 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Regarding Inmarsat Global Limited's First Request for Production of Documents to the Debtors Filed by Inmarsat Global Limited (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Service Tue 02/18 12:14 PM
Notice of Service re: Debtors' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Inmarsat Global Limited Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 1:26 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Granting Inmarsat an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond and Scheduling Related Deadlines Related [+] Order Signed on 2/12/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 02/11 7:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Granting Inmarsat and Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond and Scheduling of Related Deadlines Related [+] Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-] 1 ,12
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, February 06, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 2:06 PM
Order Correcting Adversary Proceeding Case Caption Related [+] Order Signed on 2/6/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 02/06 1:32 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Correcting Adversary Proceeding Case Caption Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
12 12 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 01/21 5:10 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Inmarsat Global Limited. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] ument1 ,2 ,3
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
11 11 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 01/14 1:41 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of John M. Conlon, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 1/14/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 7
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 01/14 1:40 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Reginald R. Goeke, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 1/14/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 01/14 1:38 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Joaquin M. C de Baca, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 1/14/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 5
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 01/14 1:37 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Maura A. McKeon, Esq. Related [+] Order Signed on 1/14/2025. (AMH)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 01/13 5:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John M. Conlon of Mayer Brown LLP . Receipt Number 4589263, Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 01/13 5:36 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Reginald R. Goeke of Mayer Brown LLP . Receipt Number 4589263, Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 01/13 5:33 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joaquin M. C de Baca of Mayer Brown LLP . Receipt Number 4589263, Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 01/13 5:24 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Maura A. McKeon of Mayer Brown LLP . Receipt Number 4589263, Filed by Ligado Networks LLC. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 57 pgs misc Exhibit Thu 01/09 7:55 PM
Exhibit(s) // Debtors' Complaint Against Inmarsat Regarding the Cooperation Agreement Related [+] Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
2 2 misc Exhibit Tue 01/07 1:16 PM
[SEALED] Exhibit(s) (Debtors' Complaint Against Inmarsat Regarding the Cooperation Agreement - SEALED) Related [+] Filed by Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc., Ligado Networks LLC. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 2 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/07 11:34 AM
Adversary case 25-50000 Complaint (Debtors' Complaint Against Inmarsat Regarding the Cooperation Agreement - REDACTED) by Ligado Networks LLC, Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc. against Inmarsat Global Limited. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 4/7/2025. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 01/07 1:19 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50000 TMH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11968984, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]