Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-06020

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:25-ap-00003
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ashot Karapetyan
9542 Charlesberg Drive
Tampa, FL 33635
Represented By
Ashot Karapetyan
contact info
Defendant
Jemma Melkonyan
9542 Charlesberg Drive
Tampa, FL 33635
Represented By
Jemma Melkonyan
contact info
Plaintiff
Hoktember Srapyan
Natalya Vartapetova, Esq. 3940 Laurel Canyon Blvd. Suite 1038
Studio City, CA 91604
Represented By
Marshall G Reissman
The Reissman Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Lianna Suleymanyan
Natalya Vartapetova, Esq. 3940 Laurel Canyon Blvd. Suite 1038
Studio City, CA 91604
Represented By
Marshall G Reissman
The Reissman Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Arsen Srapyan
Natalya Vartapetova, Esq. 3940 Laurel Canyon Blvd. Suite 1038
Studio City, CA 91604
Represented By
Marshall G Reissman
The Reissman Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/16 11:18 AM
Adversary Case 8:25-ap-3 Closed. (Faye)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Mon 03/31 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 court Notice Of Dismissed/Closed Underlying BK Case Fri 03/28 8:18 AM
Notice of Dismissed Underlying Bankruptcy Case. Bankruptcy Case Dismissed on February 18, 2025 . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 03/22 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 03/19 10:08 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/07 10:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor Filed by Michael A. Ziegler on behalf of Defendants Ashot Karapetyan, Jemma Melkonyan. (Ziegler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 01/08 8:57 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 02/07/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 01/06 5:06 PM
Complaint by Hoktember Srapyan, Lianna Suleymanyan, Arsen Srapyan against Ashot Karapetyan, Jemma Melkonyan. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [65 (Dischargeability - other)]. Related [+]
Related: [-] issman, Marshall
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D