Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-71323

Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bianca M Rucker
Case #: 5:25-ap-07002
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
400 Maryland Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Carolyn M. Carter
545 Lee Town Dr.
Pea Ridge, AR 72751
Represented By
Donald A. Brady, Jr.
Donald A. Brady, Jr. PA
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office of U.S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Service (AP) Wed 02/19 10:05 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter. (Brady, Donald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter,2 Summons Issued (auto) filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Wed 02/12 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Status hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant United States Department of Education). Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing.
Monday, February 10, 2025
7 7 court Hearing (AP Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Mon 02/10 10:21 AM
Status hearing SCHEDULE Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 01:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing. (Carter, Angie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant United States Department of Education
Friday, February 07, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/07 3:00 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Steven Mohlhenrich on behalf of Defendant United States Department of Education (Mohlhenrich, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate of Service (AP) Thu 02/06 9:33 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter. (Brady, Donald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter,2 Summons Issued (auto) filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service (AP) Fri 01/17 1:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter. (Brady, Donald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter,2 Summons Issued (auto) filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/07 9:27 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Donald A. Brady Jr.Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter. (Brady, Donald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter,2 Summons Issued (auto) filed by Plaintiff Carolyn M. Carter
Friday, January 03, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 01/03 4:32 PM
Summons Issued on United States Department of Education Answer Due 02/7/2025 (Brady, Donald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - COURT USE ONLY Fri 01/03 4:32 PM
Adversary case 5:25-ap-07002. Complaint TO DETERMINE DISCHARGEABILITY OF STUDENT LOANS by Carolyn M. Carter against United States Department of Education. Fee Amount Nature of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Brady, Donald)
Related: [-]