Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:25-cv-10041
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 7:41 AM EST
Defendant
Graig Paglieri
Represented By
Nathan D. Chapman
Kabat Chapman & Ozmer LLP
contact info
Francesco A. DeLuca
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Randstad Professionals US, LLC
Represented By
Nathan D. Chapman
Kabat Chapman & Ozmer LLP
contact info
Francesco A. DeLuca
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Terrence O'Leary
Represented By
Timothy J. Perry
Perry Krumsiek LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 9:33 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(LMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 02/20 9:21 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 2/19/2025 by video conference. Initial disclosures due by 3/7/25. Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025. Fact discovery to be completed by 9/30/25. Court adopts all interim fact discovery dates. Opening expert disclosures due by 10/15/25. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 11/11/25. Expert discovery to be completed by 12/12/2025. Motions for Summary Judgment to be filed by 10/30/2026 with opposition due 21 days after service. Status Conference set for 10/14/2025 02:45 PM in Courtroom 11 Related [+] before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact the session [LINK:here] . (Court Reporter: Debra Kane at debrakane0711@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Timothy Perry for the plaintiff. Francesco DeLuca and Chad Williams for the defendants.) (LMH)
Related: [-] mote only
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
18 18 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Wed 02/12 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Wed 02/12 5:17 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Perry, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 12:10 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Video Conference(LMH)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys Thu 01/30 12:09 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(LMH)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Thu 01/30 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2025 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11 Related [+] before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (LMH)
Related: [-] mote only
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/29 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Graig Paglieri.(DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/29 4:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Randstad Professionals US, LLC.(DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 01/24 12:40 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nathan D. Chapman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (SEC)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 01/24 12:38 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Chadwick L. Williams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (SEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nathan D. Chapman Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10801953 by Randstad Professionals US, LLC, Graig Paglieri.(DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Chadwick L. Williams Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10801940 by Randstad Professionals US, LLC, Graig Paglieri.(DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate in Support if Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Tue 01/21 4:08 PM
STATE COURT Record Graig Paglieri summons served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025; Randstad Professionals US, LLC summons served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025.. (DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/10 7:59 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to January 29, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Randstad Professionals US, LLC, Graig Paglieri. (LMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/09 3:30 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 29, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Randstad Professionals US, LLC, Graig Paglieri.(DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Wed 01/08 4:50 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (NVB)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 01/08 2:09 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (SEC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/07 4:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randstad Professionals US, LLC, Graig Paglieri. (DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/07 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Randstad Professionals US, LLC, Graig Paglieri ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10777693 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(DeLuca, Francesco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Tracking Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court CA Cover Sheet and Returns of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Category Form