New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:25-cv-00176
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
DP DREAM PAIRS INC.
Represented By
YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA
Ropes & Gray
contact info
CASSANDRA BARBARA ROTH
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
MATTHEW JOSEPH CORRIEL
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Defendant
TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC.
Represented By
YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA
Ropes & Gray
contact info
CASSANDRA BARBARA ROTH
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
MATTHEW JOSEPH CORRIEL
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Notice Only
MATTHEW A. BRAUNEL
Notice Only
SARTOUK H. MOUSSAVI
Notice Only
PHV ALAN NORMAN
Notice Only
PHV ALEX WEIDNER
Notice Only
PHV COLLIN DUNN
Notice Only
PHV MATTHEW J. RIZZOLO
Notice Only
PHV MATTHEW R. SHAPIRO
Plaintiff
COLE HAAN LLC
Represented By
STEVEN F. GOOBY
Ansa Assuncao, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
42 42 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 05/06 12:43 PM
LETTER ORDER granting41 Attorney's request to withdraw from the case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Yenis V. Argueta from this matter. **Attorney YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 5/6/2025. (mj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 11:38 AM
NOTICE by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC. Notice and Request to Withdraw Appearance (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW JOSEPH CORRIEL on behalf of DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC. (CORRIEL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/14 7:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC. re25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Yenis V. Argueta Guevara in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit G to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit H to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit I to Guevara Declaration
Monday, April 07, 2025
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 7:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by COLE HAAN LLC re25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/21 10:09 AM
Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . Granting Rule 7.1(d)(5)31 Letter filed 3/18/2025. Motion reset for 4/21/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Fri 03/21 12:13 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, COLIN DUNN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (and) Modified on 3/21/2025 (and)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Fri 03/21 12:31 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, MATTHEW J. RIZZOLO and MATTHEW R. SHAPIRO, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 03/20 3:49 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Colin Dunn to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 03/20 3:48 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew R. Shapiro to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 03/20 3:46 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew Rizzolo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 11:24 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Colin Dunn, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 3/20/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 11:10 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew R. Shapiro, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 3/20/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 11:07 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Rizzolo, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 3/20/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Thu 03/20 5:12 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee: $750.00, receipt number NEW51676 as to MATTHEW RIZZOLO, MATTHEW R. SHAPIRO & COLIN DUNN. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
31 31 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 03/18 1:50 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by COLE HAAN LLC re25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/18 10:21 AM
Set Deadlines as to29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , regarding Matthew R. Shapiro ,30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , regarding Colin Dunn ,28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , regarding Matthew Rizzolo . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
30 30 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 7:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , regarding Colin Dunn by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC..(ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Yenis V. Argueta Guevara in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Colin Dunn in Support,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
29 29 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 7:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , regarding Matthew R. Shapiro by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC..(ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Yenis V. Argueta Guevara in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew R. Shapiro in Support,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 7:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , regarding Matthew Rizzolo by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC..(ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Yenis V. Argueta Guevara in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew Rizzolo in Support,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/17 11:31 AM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (and)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
27 27 misc Certification Fri 03/14 6:38 PM
Certification of Local Civil Rule 11.2 on behalf of DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC.. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 03/14 6:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC.. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss Fri 03/14 6:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC.. Responses due by 3/24/2025.(ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Yenis Argueta Guevara in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit E to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit F to Guevara Declaration,
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA on behalf of DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 03/03 10:13 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, SARTOUK H. MOUSSAVI and MATTHEW A. BRAUNEL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 02/28 3:50 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sartouk H. Moussavi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16054685.) (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 02/28 3:47 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew A. Braunel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16054619.) (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 02/25 11:52 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALAN NORMAN and ALEX WEIDNER, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 02/24 4:56 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alex Weidner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16041028.) (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 02/24 4:52 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alan Norman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16040974.) (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 2:02 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alex Weidner, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/20/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 2:00 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sartouk Moussavi, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/20/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 1:58 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Braunel, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/20/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 1:56 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alan Norman, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/20/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 12:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alex Weidner by COLE HAAN LLC.(GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alex Weidner,
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Gooby,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 12:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sartouk Moussavi by COLE HAAN LLC.(GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sartouk Moussavi,
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Gooby,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Braunel by COLE HAAN LLC.(GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew Braunel,
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Gooby,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 12:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan Norman by COLE HAAN LLC.(GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alan Norman,
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Gooby,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/17 4:58 PM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alex Weidner ,12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan Norman ,14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sartouk Moussavi ,13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Braunel . Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 1:32 PM
LETTER ORDER: The extension requested herein is granted. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is now March 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/6/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 8:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CASSANDRA BARBARA ROTH on behalf of TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC., DP DREAM PAIRS INC. (ROTH, CASSANDRA)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Fri 01/31 4:02 PM
Letter from Cassandra B. Roth, re: requesting an unopposed extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (ROTH, CASSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/30 2:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC., filed by COLE HAAN LLC.(GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Patent No. 10,327,511),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Patent No. 10,443,163),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Patent No. 11,041,262),
Att: 4 Exhibit D (Patent No. D768,969),
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Combined Correspondence)
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLE HAAN LLC. DP DREAM PAIRS INC. served on 1/14/2025, answer due 2/4/2025. (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLE HAAN LLC. TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC. served on 1/14/2025, answer due 2/4/2025. (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 01/13 4:18 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 12, 2025
5 5 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Sun 01/12 1:13 PM
AO120 Patent Form filed. (dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Patent No. 10,327,511),
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Patent No. 10,443,163),
Att: 4 Exhibit C (Patent No. 11,041,262),
Att: 5 Exhibit D (Patent No. D768,969),
Att: 6 Exhibit E (Combined Correspondence)
4 4 service Summons Issued Sun 01/12 1:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 01/09 10:22 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COLE HAAN LLC as to DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC.. (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 01/08 11:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLE HAAN LLC identifying APAX PARTNERS LLP as Corporate Parent.. (GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/08 10:06 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/07 6:12 PM
COMPLAINT against DP DREAM PAIRS INC., TOP GLORY TRADING GROUP INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15923758) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected , filed by COLE HAAN LLC.(GOOBY, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Patent No. 10,327,511),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Patent No. 10,443,163),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Patent No. 11,041,262),
Att: 4 Exhibit D (Patent No. D768,969),
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Combined Correspondence),
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet