California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-00186
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 3:27 AM PST
Defendant
Business Wire, Inc.
Represented By
Vijay Kumar Toke
Pranger Law PC
contact info
Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk
Pranger Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nexenta by DDN, Inc.
Plaintiff
Paul Velgos
Represented By
Matthew Laurence Rollin
Sriplaw PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
37 37 misc Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 03/13 1:55 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:25-cv-02505 filed 3/13/2025. (mza)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
36 36 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Wed 03/12 11:25 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (iv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
35 35 order Transfer Case Wed 03/12 11:23 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION32 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Motion is granted. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/10 2:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos, upon Defendant NXS Holding Corp. served on 2/28/2025, answer due 3/21/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fidel Ontiverous, Clerk of the UPS Store/Person in Charge at Registered Agent's Usual Place of Mailing in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
33 33 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 03/06 7:40 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
32 32 motion Transfer Case Wed 03/05 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew L. Rollin,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/03 5:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/10/2025. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
30 30 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 9:34 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,23 as to Defendant NXS Holding Corp. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
29 29 notice Summons Request Tue 02/25 10:07 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,28 , Amended Complaint/Petition,23 filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 02/25 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Summons Request25 , Amended Complaint/Petition,23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Case number missing. Summons caption does not match Amended Complaint caption verbatim. If party names do not fit in caption space provided, enter only the name of the first party and write see attached, then attach face page of Amended Complaint or addendum to summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
27 27 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 02/24 2:46 PM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 02/24 2:42 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos, (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Summons Request Mon 02/24 2:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,23 filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Mon 02/24 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without Prejudice as to Nexenta by DDN, Inc.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 02/24 2:30 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Business Wire, Inc., Nexenta by DDN, Inc., NXS Holding Corp. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 02/03 11:11 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nexenta by DDN, Inc. answer now due 3/19/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos.(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 01/24 11:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos, upon Defendant Nexenta by DDN, Inc. served on 1/17/2025, answer due 2/7/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bill "W", Manager of Nexenta by DDN, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
20 20 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 01/23 2:40 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance17 , Notice of Appearance16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 01/23 9:28 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 01/22 3:18 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Business Wire, Inc. answer now due 3/2/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Business Wire, Inc..(Toke, Vijay)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance Wed 01/22 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk on behalf of Defendant Business Wire, Inc. (Attorney Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk added to party Business Wire, Inc.(pty:dft))(Woloszczuk, Nikolaus)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Wed 01/22 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vijay Kumar Toke on behalf of Defendant Business Wire, Inc. (Attorney Vijay Kumar Toke added to party Business Wire, Inc.(pty:dft))(Toke, Vijay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/16 12:28 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 01/15 9:49 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos, upon Defendant Business Wire, Inc. served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Agent, CT Corporation System, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
13 13 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 01/09 6:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 01/09 6:18 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-00186-FMO (ASx). (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Thu 01/09 4:56 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 01/09/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (edr)
Related: [-]
10 10 order For Order Thu 01/09 10:16 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver RE: DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. On January 8, 2025, the Clerk issued a Notice of Assignment to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. The Court directs all parties served with this order to promptly review Local Rule 73. There are strict deadlines for a party to decline consent to have a Magistrate Judge preside over this case. If a declination of consent is not received by the applicable deadline, that party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. See Order for further details. (edr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/08 10:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Business Wire, Inc.. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/08 10:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Nexenta by DDN, Inc.. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Wed 01/08 9:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 2 pgs notice Summons Request Tue 01/07 4:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Summons Request Tue 01/07 4:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 01/07 4:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos, (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 01/07 4:43 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 01/07 4:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/07 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38872130 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Paul Velgos. (Attorney Matthew Laurence Rollin added to party Paul Velgos(pty:pla))(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement