Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Judith E Levy
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 5:25-cv-10015
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Case in other court:Wayne County Circuit Court, 23-011294-NI
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
Horizon Freight System, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Thomas Franz
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Boyd
Represented By
Jordan Vahdat
Vahdat Weisman, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 notice Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case* Wed 02/26 10:12 AM
Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *2/26/2025*. Designated lead case number is 24-13158 . (JHea)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Wed 02/26 10:10 AM
ORDER Consolidating Cases and GRANTING Defendant Horizion Freight System's2 Motion. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/25 9:49 AM
NOTICE by Charles Boyd Confirming Plaintiff's Citizenship (Vahdat, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
6 6 misc Affidavit Tue 02/18 12:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT re4 Notice (Other) by All Defendants (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 order Vacate Fri 02/14 1:51 PM
ORDER Vacating3 Order to Show Cause, and Directing Plaintiff to file a notice on the docket by 2/25/2025 that confirms Plaintiffs citizenship. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/11 7:35 AM
NOTICE by Horizon Freight System, Inc. re3 Order to Show Cause, (Franz, Michael) Modified on 2/11/2025 (JBro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Answer,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 order Show Cause Tue 01/21 3:51 PM
ORDER for Defendant to Show Cause, in writing, why this case should not be remanded to the Wayne County Circuit Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 2/11/2025, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
2 2 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 01/20 10:46 AM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Horizon Freight System, Inc.. (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 01/07 9:17 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (CShr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Horizon Freight System, Inc. from the Circuit Court of Wayne County, Michigan, case number 2023-011294-NI. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10066972 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Franz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - civil complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Coversheet