California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00036
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 11:23 PM PST
Defendant
Byungkil Isaac Seo (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Yubo Jin
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brendan Barber
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/08/2025 12:11 AM PST
Sunday, January 05, 2025
Arrest of Byungkil Isaac Seo (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Byungkil Isaac Seo.(gac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Michael S Pedretti appointed for Yubo Jin. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Byungkil Isaac Seo: Initial Appearance set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brendan Barber appearing for USA. (Barber, Brendan); Attorney Brendan Barber added to party USA (pty:pla)(jrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Byungkil Isaac Seo held on 1/6/2025. Defendant not appearing. The Court orders time excluded; Excludable(s) started as to Byungkil Isaac Seo: XM - Unavailability of defendant or essential witness 1/6/25-1/7/25. The Court confirms the appointment of MW counsel Michael Pedretti(n/a) ( Initial Appearance set for 1/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.) (CD# 1/6/2025 KSC 25-1:3:36-3:37). (Plaintiff Attorney Adrian Henderson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Nina Papachristou FD-S/A, Jeremy Dang FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) Modified on 1/7/2025 (aje).
Related: [-]