New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:25-cv-00186
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Case in other court:Hunterdon County Superior Court, L-0000513-24
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 7:54 AM EST
Defendant
CITIBANK, N.A.
Represented By
WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
STEFANIE MALONE-ZEITZ
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SYED RAHMAN
307 GOBERMAN ROAD
GLEN GARDNER, NJ 08826


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 04/23 3:34 PM
Exhibit to13 Brief in Opposition to Motion - Typo Correction by SYED RAHMAN.(mlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/12 4:40 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SYED RAHMAN re9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Cover Letter
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 03/10 3:50 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by CITIBANK, N.A. re9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of William P. Reiley, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) Thu 02/20 2:31 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by SYED RAHMAN. Correction to10 Response to Motion. (amv)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/20 2:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by SYED RAHMAN re9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (amv)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) Thu 02/20 2:33 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1(c), except in an emergency, no papers shall be left with or mailed to a Judge for filing, but all pleadings shall be filed with the Clerk of Court. In the future, to expedite the processing of documents, SYED RAHMAN, shall send all filings to the Clerk's office. (amv,n.m.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss Thu 02/13 8:42 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by CITIBANK, N.A..(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Certification of William P. Reiley, Esq.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/13 9:06 AM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Mon 02/10 4:39 PM
Letter to the Court from SYED RAHMAN. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 order Text Order Tue 02/04 11:58 AM
TEXT ORDER that the Court has received Defendant's letter6 requesting a pre- motion conference. In light of the undersigned's judicial preferences which state that "[t]his letter exchange does not apply to... cases in which either side is appearing pro se," the Court will not proceed with a pre-motion conference. Defendant shall instead file its Motion by no later 02/21/2025, to be made returnable 03/17/2025. The Clerk's Office is instructed to send a copy of this order to Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail. SO ORDERED by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/4/2025. (kas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Fri 01/24 10:02 AM
Letter from Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEFANIE MALONE-ZEITZ on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A. (MALONE-ZEITZ, STEFANIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 01/08 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK, N.A..(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Wed 01/08 9:57 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (dmr3)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 01/08 9:28 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Citibank, N.A...(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/08 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITIBANK, N.A. from Hunterdon County Superior Court, case number HNT-L-0000513-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15924242), filed by CITIBANK, N.A..(REILEY, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 01/08 9:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/08 9:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 01/08 10:05 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITIBANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/29/2025. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/08 10:06 AM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]