Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gail A Weilheimer
Case #: 2:25-cv-00092
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 6:28 AM EST
Defendant
THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA
440 N. BROAD STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19130
Represented By
BONNIE M. HOFFMAN
Hangley Aronchick Segal & Pudlin
contact info
Nicholas Jordan Bellos
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
contact info
Defendant
TOMAS HANNA
Represented By
BONNIE M. HOFFMAN
Hangley Aronchick Segal & Pudlin
contact info
Nicholas Jordan Bellos
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA MESI
31 LAWRENCE LANE
TURNERSVILLE, NJ 08012
Represented By
BRIAN FARRELL
The Gold Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
SIDNEY L. GOLD
The Gold Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT A. DAVITCH
Sidkoff, Pincus & Green, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 05/14 4:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING19 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF WITHIN 10 DAYS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 5/14/25. 5/15/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/09 12:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by TOMAS HANNA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA..(HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/07 10:05 AM
ORDER THAT THE10 MOTION TO DISMISS IS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 5/6/25. 5/7/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA GREEN on behalf of LISA MESI with Certificate of Service(GREEN, SAMANTHA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 5:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by LISA MESI. (DAVITCH, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/21 5:41 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by TOMAS HANNA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA..(HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Policy No. 911,
Att: 3 Certification,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 order Stipulation and Order Order Setting Answer Deadline Tue 04/08 10:37 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ANSWER BY 4/21/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 4/7/25. 4/8/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 04/03 4:41 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA. (HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/31 11:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT "Jury Trial Demanded" against TOMAS HANNA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA, filed by LISA MESI.(FARRELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Notice of Right to Sue from U.S. DOJ dated 11 13-2024
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service to all counsel of record
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/17 10:11 AM
NOTICE by LISA MESI re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM "NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT" (FARRELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/10 5:44 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TOMAS HANNA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum of Law, Certification of Counsel.(HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Policy No. 911,
Att: 3 Certification,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, February 07, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 10:14 AM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), (e), OR (f), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION AS FURTHER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 2/7/2025. 2/7/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Bellos on behalf of THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA, TOMAS HANNA (Bellos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BONNIE M. HOFFMAN on behalf of THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA, TOMAS HANNA (HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 11:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TOMAS HANNA. TOMAS HANNA waiver sent on 1/9/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (FARRELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 11:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LISA MESI. THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 1/9/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (FARRELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/09 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to TOMAS HANNA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/9/25 (va) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/9/2025) (va)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. DAVITCH on behalf of LISA MESI (DAVITCH, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY L. GOLD on behalf of LISA MESI (GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 01/08 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against TOMS HANNA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17984988.), filed by LISA MESI.(FARRELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit "A" Notice of Right to Sue