Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephanie M Rose
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:25-cv-00003
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Case in other court:Iowa District Court Polk County, 05771 EQCE090225
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 4:51 AM CST
Defendant
Capital One Auto Finance
Represented By
Jeffrey Pilgrim
Pilgrim Christakis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandi Potts
4103 SW Westview Drive
Ankeny, IA 50023
Plaintiff
Jason Jay Potts
4103 SW Westview Drive
Ankeny, IA 50023


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
15 15 order Reconsideration Mon 04/07 3:59 PM
ORDER denying13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for details. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiffs at address listed on docket by Chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 4/7/2025. (mne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
14 14 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Wed 03/05 9:42 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION for Reconsideration re11 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,12 Judgment filed by Capital One Auto Finance. Replies due by 3/12/2025.(Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
13 13 motion Reconsideration Wed 02/26 3:55 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re11 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,12 Judgment by Jason Jay Potts, Brandi Potts.Motions referred to William P. Kelly. Responses due by 3/12/2025. (btg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
12 12 order Judgment Tue 02/18 3:25 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Capital One Auto Finance against Brandi Potts, Jason Jay Potts. Signed by Clerk of Court Chandlor G. Collins on 2/18/2025. (btg)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Remand Summary Judgment Tue 02/18 3:14 PM
ORDER granting4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs'5 Motion to Remand and6 Motion for Summary Judgment are denied. See Order for details. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiffs at address listed on docket by Chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 2/18/2025. (mne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
10 10 order Extension of Time to File Fri 02/14 2:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated in the Motion, Defendant's deadline to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to 21 days after the District Judge issues her ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 2/14/2025. (djs)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 02/14 9:45 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Capital One Auto Finance.Motions referred to William P. Kelly. Responses due by 2/28/2025. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 misc Brief /Other Thu 02/13 12:45 PM
REPLY by Jason Jay Potts, Brandi Potts in Support of5 MOTION to Remand. (nla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Tue 02/04 10:57 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand filed by Capital One Auto Finance. Replies due by 2/11/2025.(Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Wed 01/29 2:26 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jason Jay Potts, Brandi Potts. Original filed in the state court case on 7/9/24. Responses due by 2/19/2025. (sml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 motion Remand Wed 01/22 2:17 PM
MOTION to Remand by Jason Jay Potts, Brandi Potts. Responses due by 2/5/2025. (btg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/15 10:14 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capital One Auto Finance. Responses due by 1/29/2025.(Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Wed 01/08 2:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Capital One Auto Finance. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Pilgrim on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/08 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Capital One Auto Finance from Polk County District Court, case number 05771 EQCE090225. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5640157., filed by Capital One Auto Finance. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/8/2025.(Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet