Maryland District Court
Judge:James K Bredar
Case #: 1:25-cv-00064
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Habeas Corpus: INS
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 6:15 AM EST
Defendant
Keith Deville
Represented By
S. Nicole Nardone
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Harper
Represented By
S. Nicole Nardone
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Russell Holt
Acting Executive Associate Director Enforcement and Removal Operations 500 12th Street NW
Washington, DC 20536
Represented By
S. Nicole Nardone
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
S. Nicole Nardone
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
S. Nicole Nardone
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Darius Reeves
Represented By
S. Nicole Nardone
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Deymer Guerra Lemus
2401 Blueridge Ave 407
Silver Spring, MD 20902
Represented By
Laurence F Johnson
Johnson Immigration Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/24 11:06 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 3/21/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/19 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deymer Guerra Lemus (Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/19 2:59 PM
ORDER granting16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 2/19/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/19 11:49 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Keith Deville, Merrick B. Garland, Melissa Harper, Russell Holt, Alejandro Mayorkas, Darius Reeves(Nardone, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by S. Nicole Nardone on behalf of All Defendants (Nardone, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 02/06 12:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deymer Guerra Lemus. Melissa Harper served on 1/31/2025, answer due 4/1/2025.(Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 02/06 12:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deymer Guerra Lemus. Darius Reeves served on 1/24/2025, answer due 3/25/2025.(Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt
Thursday, January 30, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 01/30 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deymer Guerra Lemus. Merrick B. Garland served on 1/22/2025, answer due 3/24/2025.(Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 01/29 11:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deymer Guerra Lemus. U.S. Attorney served 01/16/2025, answer due 3/17/2025.(Johnson, Laurence) Modified on 1/29/2025 (bw5s)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
misc Civil Case Filing Fee Wed 01/15 8:07 AM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-11708848(Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 01/14 2:44 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Merrick B. Garland(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/14 2:36 PM
NOTICE by Deymer Guerra Lemus re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus SUMMONS - Merrick B. Garland (Johnson, Laurence) (bw5s)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/14/2025) Corrected Summons
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/14 1:47 PM
NOTICE by Deymer Guerra Lemus re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Civil Cover Sheet (Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee Tue 01/14 4:47 PM
The case of Guerra Lemus v. Garland et al , has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 1:25-cv-00064-JKB . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours . To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents . Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 01/10 12:04 PM
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 01/10 11:52 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Deymer Guerra Lemus was filed incompletely. **Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. **Pursuant to Local Rule 102.2, the original complaint caption "shall contain the names and addresses of all parties and the county of residence of any Maryland party". Please ensure future filings are in compliance with the local rules. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 01/10 11:50 AM
QC NOTICE: **No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. The changes have been made by the Clerk.** When opening new cases in the future, please refrain from capitalizing entire names of parties. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 01/10 11:48 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Deymer Guerra Lemus was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to 1 . (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 01/10 11:42 AM
QC NOTICE:2 Certificate of Service, filed by Deymer Guerra Lemus was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/10 8:32 AM
Case Assigned to Judge James K Bredar. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/09 12:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deymer Guerra Lemus re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus SUMMONS(Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons-Civil (Alejandro Mayorkas),
Att: 2 Summons Summons-Civil (Melissa Harper),
Att: 3 Summons Summons-Civil (Erek Barron),
Att: 4 Summons Summons-Civil (Keith Deville),
Att: 5 Summons Summons-Civil (Darius Reeves),
Att: 6 Summons Summons-Civil (Russell Hott)
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 01/08 6:23 PM
Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Deymer Guerra Lemus.(Johnson, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Supplement,
Att: 4 Supplement,
Att: 5 Supplement