Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:25-cv-00070
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 6:47 AM EST
Defendant
David Forman
Represented By
Alyssa Grace Gill
Berman Fink Van Horn P.C.
contact info
Daniel H. Park
Berman Fink Van Horn P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mastermind Assurance, LLC
Represented By
Alyssa Grace Gill
Berman Fink Van Horn P.C.
contact info
Daniel H. Park
Berman Fink Van Horn P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Anthracite Holdco, L.P.
Interested Party
Anthracite Topco, Inc.
Plaintiff
Coalfire Systems, Inc.
Represented By
John Gregory Perry
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) Llp-Atl
contact info
Lela M. Ames
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) Llp-Dc
contact info
Kathleen O. Gallagher
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) Llp-Dc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 05/08 4:36 PM
ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: Counts One, Three, Four, and Seven of Plaintiff's Complaint1 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, but Plaintiff's other claims survive. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/8/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 1 pgs misc Leave of Absence Fri 03/28 2:31 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 7, 8, 9, 10, and 11, 2025, July 23, 24, and 25, 2025, by Daniel H. Park. (Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 03/05 8:08 AM
Submission of11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
18 18 17 pgs respm Reply Brief Tue 03/04 2:57 PM
REPLY BRIEF re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Forman, Mastermind Assurance, LLC. (Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Grace Gill on behalf of David Forman, Mastermind Assurance, LLC (Gill, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 02/21 10:14 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed until after the Court resolves the pending Motion to Dismiss. Entered by Judge Leigh Martin May on 02/21/2025. (LMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 02/20 9:27 AM
Submission of12 MOTION to Stay Discovery to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 10 pgs respm Reply Brief Wed 02/19 11:17 AM
REPLY BRIEF re12 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by David Forman, Mastermind Assurance, LLC. (Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
14 14 26 pgs respm Response to Motion Tue 02/18 12:24 PM
RESPONSE re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Coalfire Systems, Inc.. (Perry, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
13 13 3 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 02/07 5:07 PM
RESPONSE re12 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Coalfire Systems, Inc.. (Perry, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
12 12 motion Stay Mon 02/03 5:24 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Mastermind Assurance, LLC, David Forman.(Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
11 11 4 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/03 5:17 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mastermind Assurance, LLC, David Forman.(Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Brief
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/03 5:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mastermind Assurance, LLC, David Forman. (Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
9 9 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 01/14 10:43 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Coalfire Systems, Inc.. David Forman served on 1/13/2025; Mastermind Assurance, LLC served on 1/13/2025. (Perry, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 01/13 9:03 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kathleen O. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13979268). Attorney Kathleen O. Gallagher added appearing on behalf of Coalfire Systems, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 01/13 9:06 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Lela M. Ames Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13979250). Attorney Lela M. Ames added appearing on behalf of Coalfire Systems, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 9:54 AM
ORAL ORDER granting8 Application for Admission of Kathleen O. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/13/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 9:55 AM
ORAL ORDER granting7 Application for Admission of Lela M. Ames Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/13/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 11:14 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Kathleen O. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13979268).by Coalfire Systems, Inc.. (Perry, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 11:10 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Lela M. Ames Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13979250).by Coalfire Systems, Inc.. (Perry, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/09 4:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coalfire Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthracite Buyer, Inc. for Coalfire Systems, Inc.. (Perry, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 01/08 5:13 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff filed a complaint in which it seeks, among other things, a preliminary injunction. Dkt. No.1 at 43-45. A request for a preliminary injunction must be filed by separate motion. After filing an appropriate motion, the movant must contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy, Ms. Brittany Poley, to request expedited consideration. No motion for preliminary injunction has been filed. The Court therefore will not take action on the demand for preliminary injunction at this time. If Plaintiff later decides to pursue a preliminary injunction, the undersigned may consider that request when a separate motion is made. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/8/2025. (tcc) Modified on 1/8/2025 (tcc).
Related: [-]
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Wed 01/08 4:30 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/8/2025. (bnp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 01/08 3:41 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Mastermind Assurance, LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 01/08 3:40 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to David Forman. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
1 1 45 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/08 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT with Request for Injunctive Relief with Jury Demand filed by Coalfire Systems, Inc.. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13973329)(cpp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/8/2025 to add request for injunctive relief to docket text (cpp).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 9 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 39 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 38 pgs Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 3 pgs Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 2 pgs Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 2 pgs Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 4 pgs Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 2 pgs Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 2 pgs Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 2 pgs Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 13 pgs Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 4 pgs Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 3 pgs Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet