Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:25-cv-00082
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 6:49 AM EST
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff
Christine Lawrence
3341 PineHill Drive
Decatur, GA 30032
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Represented By
Casondra Turner
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
19 19 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 04/25 4:19 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the action be, and the same hereby, is dismissed with prejudice. (dgr)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Final Report and Recommendation Fri 04/25 4:13 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objections to the R&R17 are OVERRULED. The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the Final Report and Recommendation15 as the Opinion and Order of this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint11 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint6 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this file. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/25/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 04/25 12:17 PM
Submission of FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Christine Lawrence,6 Amended Complaint, filed by Christine Lawrence, and15 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A., to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 4:20 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christine Lawrence re18 Order and19 Clerk's Judgment. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/25 4:22 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Wed 04/16 3:05 PM
OBJECTIONS to15 Report and Recommendation filed by Christine Lawrence. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 04/07 3:03 PM
ORDER for Service of15 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/7/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 04/07 3:00 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the11 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED and that the Amended Complaint be dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/7/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 04/07 3:02 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the6 Amended Complaint be dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/7/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/07 3:04 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christine Lawrence re16 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and15 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 04/03 4:25 PM
Clerk's Notation re13 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/24 10:44 AM
Submission of11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (lme)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendation Fri 03/21 3:05 PM
ORDER. The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the Final Report and Recommendation7 as the Opinion and Order of the Court. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Bank of America, N.A.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this matter to Judge Catherine M. Salinas for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/21/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 03/21 11:27 AM
Submission of3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/21 3:06 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christine Lawrence re14 Order. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/21 3:07 PM
Submission of14 Order to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/19 4:05 PM
Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North American Holding Company, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holding Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/11 2:44 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christine Lawrence re8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss Thu 03/06 3:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Bank of America, N.A..(Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Laughlin Allen on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Allen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/05 2:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christine Lawrence. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/24 8:26 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christine Lawrence re8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 02/24 8:24 AM
ORDER for Service of7 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/21/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 02/24 8:22 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/21/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 3:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Christine Lawrence.(ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 02/14 11:25 AM
Clerk's Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/10 3:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate BAC North American Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of America, N.A., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America Corporation. (Turner, Casondra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 3:41 PM
ORDER. Defendant is ORDERED to file the certificate of interested persons no later than Tuesday, February 11, 2025. Failure to file a certificate of interested persons by the stated deadline may result in a recommendation that sanctions be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/7/2025. (dgr)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/07 2:35 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bank of America Corporation.(Turner, Casondra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/07 3:44 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christine Lawrence re4 Order. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 4:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/08 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christine Lawrence. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100016579)(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet