North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:25-cv-00013
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseDiversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 6:45 AM EST
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Price
Manier & Herod
contact info
Plaintiff
VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC
Represented By
Antonio Eugene Lewis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/09 3:39 PM
ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion to Stay and further proceedings will be stayed pending the outcome of arbitration. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 5/9/2025. (llp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
22 22 motion Stay Thu 05/08 5:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC. Responses due by 5/22/2025 (Lewis, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of David Wallach,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 05/06 2:12 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC (Lewis, Antonio)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Intervene Tue 05/06 10:54 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Clayco, Inc.'s 12 Motion to Intervene. No party has opposed intervention, which is permitted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 24. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 5/6/2025. (mek)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Mon 04/21 3:01 PM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/12/2025. (mek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 04/16 7:17 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Price, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 7:15 PM
NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference of VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Price, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 7:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Price, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Correction by Clayco, Inc. re14 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/18 5:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clayco, Inc.. (Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Tue 03/18 4:47 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Clayco, Inc.. (Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 03/18 4:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Intervene by Clayco, Inc.. (Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Declaration Tue 03/18 4:44 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew C. Bouchard filed by Clayco, Inc.(Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Clayco GAI and Resolution,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - AIA-A133 Agreement between VinFast and Clayco,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - AIA-A201 General Conditions
12 12 motion Intervene Tue 03/18 4:37 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Clayco, Inc.. Responses due by 4/1/2025 (Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer and Counterclaim
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Garfunkel on behalf of Clayco, Inc. (Garfunkel, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Williams Magee on behalf of Clayco, Inc. (Magee, Clare)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Charles Bouchard on behalf of Clayco, Inc. (Bouchard, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Durnovich on behalf of Clayco, Inc. (Durnovich, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/25 12:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Price, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/24 8:47 AM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 4/16/2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Certificate Of Settlement Conference on or before 4/16/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/21/2025. (brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/21 11:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Price, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
4 4 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Thu 01/09 12:46 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC. (Lewis, Antonio)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/09 12:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC. (Lewis, Antonio)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/09 8:09 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cjs)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC Thu 01/09 8:07 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (cjs)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Thu 01/09 8:09 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (cjs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/08 7:28 PM
COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Specific Performance against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BNCWDC-6801104), filed by VinFast Manufacturing US, LLC.(Lewis, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1,
Att: 2 Appendix 2,
Att: 3 Appendix 3,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/09 8:07 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cjs)
Related: [-]