Harris v. The State of Texas
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Referred: | Brian Mckay |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00049 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE filed by Robert L Harris, IV re:18 Second Order And Notice of Deficiency. (axm) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Robert L Harris, IV must address the following deficiency: must submit a certificate of inmate trust account or comparable form, such as a resident account summary. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 3/10/2025) (kcr) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/10 8:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18. Mon Mar 10 08:57:17 CDT 2025 (crt) |
||
Thursday, February 20, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert L Harris, IV. (cfk) |
|
16 | 16
![]() AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert L Harris, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cfk) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Copy Request by Robert L Harris, IV with Deputy Clerk Response. (knb) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (F1975636 - Writ of Habeas Corpus of Mandamus) to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (ykp) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Supplemental Document by Robert L Harris, IV as to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cfk) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Supplemental Document by Robert L Harris, IV as to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cfk) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Supplement to 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (agc) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Supplement to 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (agc) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Supplement to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (agc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 01/14 9:01 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Jan 14 09:01:44 CST 2025 (crt) |
||
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order and Notice of Deficiency: Robert L Harris, IV must address the following deficiency: The specific relief sought by Harris in this Court is not clear. If he is seeking to proceed pro se and to conduct discovery in his pending state cases, he must file his requests in the appropriate state court. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 1/13/2025) (ndt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 08, 2025 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 01/08 11:00 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Jan 8 11:00:19 CST 2025 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (F1975636 - Motion for Discovery and Inspection of Evidence) to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (knb) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (F1975636 - Motion to Appear Pro Se) to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (knb) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (F2400184 - Motion for Discovery and Inspection of Evidence) to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (knb) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (F2400184 - Motion to Appear Pro Se) to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Robert L Harris, IV. (knb) |
|
3 | 3
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert L Harris, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (knb) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (knb) |
|
1 | 1
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge McKay (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb) |