Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00065
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 12:49 AM MST
Defendant
Daniel Noe Lopez-Silva (1)
Represented By
Nancy Janeth Arce
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick Thomas Barry
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2025 3:07 AM MST
Sunday, January 05, 2025
Arrest of Daniel Noe Lopez-Silva on 1/5/2025. (CXE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Daniel Noe Lopez-Silva. (CXE)
Related: [-]