Alaska District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00004
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 11:43 PM AKST
Defendant
Robert William Solesky (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Alexander
U.S. Attorney'S Office (anch)
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2025 12:06 AM AKST
Monday, January 06, 2025
Notice of Arrest of Robert William Solesky. The defendant was arrested 1/5/25 and is located at ACC. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Robert William Solesky (1). (LMH, COURT STAFF, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/7/2025 with KFR initials on each page, NEF regenerated) (CME, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Solesky
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
2 2 KFR TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Robert William Solesky: An Initial Appearance on Complaint1 /Detention Hearing is set for 1/8/2025 at 2:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Kyle F. Reardon. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]