New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00016
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 12:35 AM MST
Defendant
Carlos Ortiz-Robles (1)
Represented By
Damian Rasmussen
Law Offices Of Damian Rasmussen
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Diana Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Silvia Teresa Delgado
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2025 2:41 AM MST
Friday, December 06, 2024
Arrest of Carlos Ortiz-Robles (rh) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
Hearing as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles: Initial Appearance set for 12/11/2024 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (rh) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles. Attorney Silvia Teresa Delgado for USA added. (cer) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles. (cer) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth: Initial Appearance as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles held on 12/11/2024. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Mark Noferi; AFPD: Francisco Valcarcel; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Enith Valdes-Ortiz. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:52 AM - 9:55 AM. Time In Session: 9:55 AM - 10:00 AM. Courtroom Deputy: Kristin Solis. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez for 12/16/2024, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (cer) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth (cer) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Damian Rasmussen for Carlos Ortiz-Robles by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth (vrr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Lopez, Diana) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Hearings by Carlos Ortiz-Robles (Rasmussen, Damian) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles by Magistrate Judge Barbara S. Evans (cer) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles by Magistrate Judge Barbara S. Evans. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (I) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cer) [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles: Change of Plea Hearing set for 1/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. [ Interpreter Needed ](kls) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01815-GBW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
Related: [-]
11 11 INFORMATION as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles (1) count(s) 1. (cer)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Carlos Ortiz-Robles (cer)
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Carlos Ortiz-Robles (cer)
Related: [-]
14 14 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles (cer)
Related: [-]
15 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth: Plea Hearing as to Carlos Ortiz-Robles held on 1/7/2025, Plea entered by Carlos Ortiz-Robles (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (Interpreter: Juan Ramirez) (cer)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Organ