Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00022
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 2:49 AM CST
Defendant
Kevin Duran (1)
Represented By
Elaine L. Mustard
Law Office Of Elaine L. Mustard
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA Pecos
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2025 3:34 AM CST
Friday, January 03, 2025
Arrest of Kevin Duran (jh1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Kevin Duran by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Kevin Duran. (jh1)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Kevin Duran held on 1/7/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/15/2025 09:30 AM in Alpine before Judge David B. Fannin,), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Kevin Duran, Oral Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Kevin Duran (Court Reporter FTR-ALPINE.) (jh1)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Elaine L. Mustard for Kevin Duran appointed. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Kevin Duran. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
5 5 Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Kevin Duran. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Kevin Duran. (jh1)
Related: [-]