Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-mc-00001
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Wed 02/26 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Petitioner United States of America (Bohl, Nickolas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
2 2 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 4:21 PM
ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1782 re1 Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Commissioner Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (cc: certified copy to AUSA) (RE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
1 1 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/08 1:00 PM
(EX PARTE) MOTION for Appointment of Commissioner Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782, filed by Petitioner United States of America. Noting Date 1/7/2025. (RE) (RE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED Order Appointing Commissioner,
Att: 2 Declaration of Nickolas Bohl in Support of Motion to Appoint Commissioner,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Proposed Commissioner's Subpoena,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Expedia Business Information,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Email requesting case
Att: 7 (1/8/2025) Ex A- Letter of Request