Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Case #: 8:25-cv-00044
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 7:35 AM EST
Appellant
Roy W. Bruce, Jr.
867 Hanover Way
Lakeland, FL 33813
Appellee
Kelly Remick
Represented By
Lydia Marie Gazda
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 appeal Appellant's reply brief - bankruptcy Fri 04/25 2:28 PM
APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (eportal)(GL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 7:37 AM
NOTICE by Kelly Remick of Receipt of Brief Docketed in Other Case (Gazda, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of lis pendens Tue 03/18 1:50 PM
NOTICE of lis pendens by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
20 20 appeal Appellant's reply brief - bankruptcy Thu 03/13 10:25 AM
APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-J
Thursday, March 06, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 03/06 5:26 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The appellant's motion (Doc. 17 ) to extend the time within which to file a reply brief is GRANTED-IN-PART. Not later than MARCH 27, 2025, the appellant must reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2025. (JTM)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/06 5:25 PM
ORDER denying 11 --motion to stay; denying as moot 17 --motion for a ruling on the pending motion to stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2025. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/04 11:30 AM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Rule on Pending Emergency Motion for Stay11 by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 03/04 11:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 Appellee's brief - bankruptcy by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 02/19 4:42 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. Related case(s): Yes. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 appeal Appellee's brief - bankruptcy Thu 02/13 9:09 AM
APPELLEE'S BRIEF by Kelly Remick. (Gazda, Lydia)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 9:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Notice of docketing bankruptcy appeal re Rule 8018 by Kelly Remick. (Gazda, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 02/06 12:36 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. Related case(s): Yes. (eportal) (GL)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stay Preliminary Injunction Thu 02/06 12:31 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay pending Appeal and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (eportal) (Chambers Notified)(GL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 appeal Appellant's brief - bankruptcy Wed 02/05 1:43 PM
APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 01/27 11:58 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 5 --Motion to Stay; denying as moot 7 --Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/27/2025. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 misc Transcript Thu 01/23 9:58 AM
BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Initial Confirmation Hearing held on 12/4/24 before Judge Roberta A. Colton. (JNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 motion Stay Wed 01/22 12:57 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay re4 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal by Roy W. Bruce, Jr.(AA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 motion Disclosure Tue 01/21 4:20 PM
Disclosure AND Notice of Pending Motion by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. (AA) Modified on 1/21/2025 (AA)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Stay Tue 01/21 4:17 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay re4 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal by Roy W. Bruce, Jr.(AA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate
4 4 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Tue 01/21 4:11 PM
CORRECTED BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Roy W. Bruce, Jr. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:24bk05709RCT. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/26/2024. (AA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 appeal Notice of docketing bankruptcy appeal re Rule 8018 Wed 01/15 1:30 PM
NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 01/08/2025. (BD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
2 2 appeal Transmission of Bankruptcy appeal record Tue 01/14 11:07 AM
BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Roy W. Bruce, Jr..(Miguenes, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 - Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 3 - Order on Appeal,
Att: 3 4 - Statement of Issues on Appeal #66,
Att: 4 5 - Appellant Designation,
Att: 5 6 - Appellee Designation #69,
Att: 6 7 - Public Docket,
Att: 7 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13_Installments,
Att: 8 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000005_Administrative_Order_FLMB-2023-3_Prescribing_Procedures_for_Chapter_13_Cases_fil,
Att: 9 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000015_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Administrative_Order_FLMB-2023-3_Prescribing_Procedur,
Att: 10 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000021_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Roy_W_B,
Att: 11 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000023_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Debtors_Chapter_13_Plan_With_Certificate_Of_Servic,
Att: 12 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000024_ParT_1_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_with_Prejudice_for_Cause_and_for_Failure_to_Comply_with_T,
Att: 13 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000024_ParT_2_,
Att: 14 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000025_Motion_to_Stay_the_Bankruptcy_and_Request_for_Emergency_Hearing_Filed_by_Debtor,
Att: 15 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000027_Objection_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_with_Prejudice_for_Cause_and_for_F,
Att: 16 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000031_Response_to_US_Bank_National_Associations_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Debtors,
Att: 17 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000033_Motion_to_Review_the_Claimed_Original_Note_Provided_by_US_Bank_National_Asoociat,
Att: 18 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000046_Amended_Summary_of_Assets__Amended_Schedule_AB_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Req,
Att: 19 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000050_Order_Denying_Motion_To_Stay_the_Bankruptcy_and_Request_for_Emergency_Hearing_as,
Att: 20 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000051_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Review_the_Claimed_Original_Note_Provided_by_US_Bank_Nat,
Att: 21 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000057_Amended_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Dismissal_With_Prejudice_and_One-Year_Bar,
Att: 22 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000059_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_With_Prejudice_and_Imposing_a_Bar_to_Futur,
Att: 23 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000062_Emergency_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Request_for_Expedited_Hearing_Filed,
Att: 24 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000064_Order_Denying_Debtors_Emergency_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Request_for,
Att: 25 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000070_Order_Denying_Amended_Motion_for_Reconsideration,
Att: 26 A 8-24-bk-05709_Docket_000074_Order_Correcting_Designated_Appellee,
Att: 27 B 8-21-bk-06275_Docket_000203_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor,
Att: 28 B 8-21-bk-06275_Docket_000224_Order_Denying_Confirmation_of_Chapter_13_Plan_and_Dismissing_Case_This_Order_is,
Att: 29 B 8-21-bk-06275_Docket_000227_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Denying_Confirmation_and_Dismi,
Att: 30 B 8-21-bk-06275_Docket_000260_Order_entered_on_September_29_2023_by_District_Court_Judge_Tom_Barber_Re_Appe,
Att: 31 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000027_Order_Directing_Debtor_to_Make_Election_of_Dismissal_as_to_Simultaneous_Bankrupt,
Att: 32 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000067_Amended_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor,
Att: 33 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000080_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_ofOrder_Directing_Debtor_to_Make_Elect,
Att: 34 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000094_Order_Dismissing_Case_For_Failure_to_Make_Election,
Att: 35 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_1_Motion_for_Prospective_Relief_from_Stay,
Att: 36 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_2_,
Att: 37 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_3_,
Att: 38 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_4_,
Att: 39 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_5_,
Att: 40 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_6_,
Att: 41 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_7_,
Att: 42 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000107_ParT_8_,
Att: 43 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000110_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Prospective_Relief_from_Stay,
Att: 44 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000114_Memorandum_IN_OPPOSITION_TO_DEBTOR_ALICE_BRUCES_MOTION_FOR_RECONSIDERAION_OF_THE,
Att: 45 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000115_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Directing_Debtor_to_Make_Elect,
Att: 46 C 8-23-bk-02615_Docket_000117_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_for_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Prospecti
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Thu 01/09 9:08 AM
BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Roy W. Bruce. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:24bk05709RCT. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/26/2024.(AA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court