Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Case #: 4:25-cv-00029
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 4:03 AM CST
Defendant
Distressed Asset Portfolio III, LLC
Defendant
First National Collection Bureau Inc
Plaintiff
Daniel Rizvi
Represented By
Heather Bryn Hersh
Jaffer Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/28 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel Rizvi (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 12:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Rizvi. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Rizvi. First National Collection Bureau Inc served on 1/13/2025. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 9:32 AM
***DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED IN ERROR.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Rizvi. Distressed Asset Portfolio III, LLC served on 1/13/2025. (Hersh, Heather) Modified on 1/16/2025 (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 01/14 12:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibit A served on Distressed Asset Portfolio III, LLC Registered Agent on 01/13/2025, filed by Daniel Rizvi. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 01/14 12:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibit A served on First National Credit Bureau, Inc Registered Agent on 01/13/2025, filed by Daniel Rizvi. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 3:41 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to First National Collection Bureau Inc. (jmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Distressed Asset Portfolio III, LLC. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 01/09 10:49 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Daniel Rizvi (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10608391.), filed by Daniel Rizvi.(Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/10 12:46 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 01/10 12:47 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]