Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:24-bk-70142

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul M Black
Case #: 7:25-ap-07001
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hanscom Federal Credit Union, Defendant
Peter Rice, President/CEO Operations Center, 25 Porter Road
Littleton, MA 01460
Represented By
Hanscom Federal Credit Union
contact info
Defendant
Associated Credit Services, Inc., Defendant
Andrew B. Robinson, Reg. Agent 3 Highwood Drive Suite 102E
Tewksbury, MA 01876
Represented By
Associated Credit Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Kenneth Kravitz, Plaintiff
558 Mendham Way
Salem, VA 24153
Represented By
Heather Parsons
Giles & Lambert, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Leigh Kravitz, Plaintiff
558 Mendham Way
Salem, VA 24153
Represented By
Heather Parsons
Giles & Lambert, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/12 9:19 AM
Adversary Case 7:25-ap-7001 Closed (Maddox, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 02/25 1:39 PM
Disposition of Adversary 7:2025-ap-7001-pmb Dismissing Adversary Complaint with prejudice upon motion of the Plaintiffs. Case to Be Closed if Applicable 03/11/2025. (Maddox, Lisa)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/25 11:08 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiffs Amanda Leigh Kravitz, John Kenneth Kravitz (Parsons, Heather)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/12 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/10 2:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Heather Parsons on behalf of Amanda Leigh Kravitz, John Kenneth Kravitz Related [+]. (Parsons, Heather)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Thu 01/09 9:03 AM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff Defendant Motion or Answer Due Date 2/10/2025. (Maddox, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/08 2:58 PM
Adversary case 25-07001 Complaint by Heather Parsons on behalf of John Kenneth Kravitz, Amanda Leigh Kravitz against Hanscom Federal Credit Union, Associated Credit Services, Inc.. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount $0.00. AP Service Due 02/27/2025. Nature of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Parsons, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D