Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 4:25-cv-00034
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 5:13 AM EST
Defendant
Ventra Salem, LLC
800 Pennsylvania Avenue
Salem, OH 44460
Represented By
Elizabeth L. Bolduc
Eastman & Smith
contact info
Lynn Vuketich Luther
Eastman & Smith - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacy Davidson
Represented By
Shannon M. Draher
Nilges Draher
contact info
Hans A. Nilges
Nilges Draher
contact info
Robi J. Baishnab
Nilges Draher
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss Order on Motion to withdraw document Thu 05/01 3:13 PM
Order denying as moot Defendant's first partial Motion to dismiss Related [+]. Defendant's 2nd partial Motion to dismiss is withdrawn. The parties joint Motion to withdraw document and to set an answer date is granted. Defendants answer to Plaintiff's amended complaint (Doc.14 ) is due on or before May 30, 2025. Judge John R. Adams on 5/1/25.(K,C)
Related: [-] 13 15 18
18 18 motion Withdraw Document Thu 05/01 11:25 AM
Joint Motion to withdraw document Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Stipulation Regarding Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ventra Salem, LLC. Related document(s)14 ,15 . (Bolduc, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Thu 04/17 3:18 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's (15 ) partial Motion to dismiss Partial . Judge John R. Adams on 4/17/25.(K,C)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 04/17 11:26 AM
Joint Motion for extension of time until 5/2/2025 to file response/reply to15 Motion to dismiss Partial filed by Plaintiff Stacy Davidson. Related document(s)15 .(Baishnab, Robi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 04/04 4:08 PM
Motion to dismiss Partial filed by Defendant Ventra Salem, LLC. Related document(s)14 . (Bolduc, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/21 9:38 AM
Amended complaint against Ventra Salem, LLC. Filed by Stacy Davidson. (Baishnab, Robi)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 03/10 4:10 PM
Motion to dismiss Partial filed by Defendant Ventra Salem, LLC. (Bolduc, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 02/26 2:07 PM
Notice Of Filing Consent To Join Form Pursuant To 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Stacy Davidson.(Baishnab, Robi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 02/10 11:22 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ventra Salem, LLC answer due 3/9/2025. Judge John R. Adams on 2/10/25.(K,C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 02/06 12:05 PM
Notice Of Filing Consent To Join Form Pursuant To 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Stacy Davidson.(Baishnab, Robi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 02/06 9:19 AM
Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. Bolduc filed by on behalf of Ventra Salem, LLC. (Bolduc, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 02/06 9:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ventra Salem, LLC. (Luther, Lynn)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension (answer complaint) Thu 02/06 9:16 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 9, 2025 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Ventra Salem, LLC. Related document(s)1 .(Luther, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 02/06 9:14 AM
Attorney Appearance by Lynn Vuketich Luther filed by on behalf of Ventra Salem, LLC. (Luther, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 01/23 3:57 PM
Notice Of Filing Consent To Join Form Pursuant To 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Stacy Davidson.(Baishnab, Robi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 01/22 2:14 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ventra Salem, LLC on 1/16/2025, filed on behalf of Stacy Davidson. Related document(s)2 . (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
oth_evt Service by Clerk Tue 01/14 4:28 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ventra Salem, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7022 1670 0003 3730 5275. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 01/10 12:48 PM
Notice Of Filing Consent To Join Form Pursuant To 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Stacy Davidson.(Draher, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 01/10 8:38 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ventra Salem, LLC. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 01/10 8:28 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 01/10 8:30 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 1:38 PM
Complaint with Jury Demand against Ventra Salem, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12902696.. Filed by Stacy Davidson. (Draher, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons