Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Becerra
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:25-cv-20133
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
ADAS SMART LLC
Represented By
Austin Anthony Laurienzo
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
PHILIP BROSSY
Represented By
Austin Anthony Laurienzo
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERTO VECIANA
Represented By
Robert Scott Norell
Robert S. Norell P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/17 10:24 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by ADAS SMART LLC, PHILIP BROSSY. (Laurienzo, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/10 8:30 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL, CALENDAR CALL, REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: ( Jury Trial set for 4/20/2026 09:30 AM before Judge Jacqueline Becerra., Calendar Call set for 4/14/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Jacqueline Becerra.). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 3/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 03/04 4:30 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by ROBERTO VECIANA(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:39 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERTO VECIANA (Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/24 1:22 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAS SMART LLC, PHILIP BROSSY identifying Corporate Parent Maroon and Black Holdings, Inc. for ADAS SMART LLC (Laurienzo, Austin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 02/11 4:08 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 2/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 02/11 4:00 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint no later than March 17, 2025 . Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 2/11/2025. (nsy)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 02/11 3:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by ADAS SMART LLC, PHILIP BROSSY. Attorney Austin Anthony Laurienzo added to party ADAS SMART LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Austin Anthony Laurienzo added to party PHILIP BROSSY(pty:dft).(Laurienzo, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/09 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to ADAS SMART LLC, PHILIP BROSSY. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 01/09 4:15 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18105765, filed by ROBERTO VECIANA.(Norell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)