Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Referred: Ryon M Mccabe
Case #: 9:25-cv-80037
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
Century Surety Company
Represented By
Jennifer Virginia Ortega
Simon, Reed & Salazar, P..A.
contact info
Michael Simon
Simon, Reed & Salazar, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
All Good Things Antiques & Collectibles
Represented By
Alejandro E Lopez
Tarnovsky Law
contact info
Irina Tarnovsky
Bernstein Polsky PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 05/05 7:24 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Pamela Perry and Setting Additional Requirements. Mediation Hearing set for 5/22/2025 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 04/29 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 5/22/2025 at 10:00 a.m..(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 04/29 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Pamela Perry, Century Surety Company as Mediator. (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/28 11:27 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Aileen M. Cannon: Status Conference held on March 28, 2025. The parties addressed their non-compliance with the mediator selection deadline in the Court's Scheduling Order11 . Compliant mediator selection notice due April 29, 2025 , with no extensions. No current discovery issues reported. Order to follow. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Alex Lopez and Jennifer Ortega. Court Reporter: Laura Melton, 305-523-5633/ Laura_Melton@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jj01)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/04 2:10 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/28/2025 10:45 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon via Zoom. The Zoom link and information will be emailed to the parties of record before the scheduled hearing. All participants are expected to appear by audio and video in a professional and quiet setting, with a reliable internet connection tested sufficiently in advance of the scheduled hearing. The parties shall prepare in advance and be ready to discuss the status and background of the case in detail, including the nature of the claim(s) at issue and all completed and outstanding discovery. All counsel appearing before the Court must have a properly filed Notice of Appearance on the docket prior to the hearing and be fully familiar with the specifics of the case, including discovery. (jj01)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
12 12 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 02/04 7:03 AM
ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 2/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/03 4:11 PM
ORDER Setting Trial, Setting Pre-Trial Deadlines, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge. ( Jury Trial set for 3/23/2026 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Calendar Call set for 3/17/2026 01:45 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2025., Discovery due by 9/30/2025., Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 2/17/2025., Mediation Deadline 10/17/2025., In Limine Motions due by 2/5/2026., Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2025., Motions due by 10/31/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/5/2026.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 01/31 2:25 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Century Surety Company(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order Setting Trial and Other Pretrial Deadlines
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/31 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandro E Lopez on behalf of All Good Things Antiques & Collectibles. Attorney Alejandro E Lopez added to party All Good Things Antiques & Collectibles(pty:pla). (Lopez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 01/29 12:38 PM
STATUS REPORT Defendant's, Century Surety Company, Removal Status Report by Century Surety Company (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/23 4:19 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Century Surety Company identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Ameritrust Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Miracle Nova II LLC, Corporate Parent Miracle Nova I LLC, Corporate Parent Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Accident Fund Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Emergent Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Star Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Vitor DeOliveira of All Claims Public Adjuster, Other Affiliate All Claims Public Adjuster for Century Surety Company (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 01/22 6:51 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/31/2025. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 01/16 12:31 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Century Surety Company.(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/13 8:35 AM
Notice of Court Practices in Removal Cases. ( Removal Status Report due by 2/10/2025.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 01/10 7:24 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 01/10/2025. (jj01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/10 8:18 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 01/09 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18105460, filed by Century Surety Company.(Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Composite B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Composite C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E