Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:25-cv-00034
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 5:25 AM EST
Defendant
HOTLEATHERS.COM, INC.
Plaintiff
Jonathan Drummond
Represented By
Aleksandra Kravets
Aleksandra Kravets, Esq. P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
SHAF International, Inc.
Terminated: 01/27/2025


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/21 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 4:40 PM
ORDER re 15 Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/18/2025. (ABD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of settlement Thu 04/17 10:58 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Jonathan Drummond (Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 04/17 10:50 AM
ORDER to show cause as to Jonathan Drummond. A review of this case finds that the Amended Complaint in this action was filed January 27, 2025, and it appears service was executed on the defendant on or about February 26, 2025. Defendant has failed respond to the complaint. Plaintiff has not applied for entry of default, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) within the time provided in Local Rule 1.10(b), or as further extended by the Court. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the complaint against the Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10, M.D. Fla. Failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the defendants without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/17/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 service Summons returned executed Thu 02/27 10:15 AM
RETURN of service executed on 2/26/25 by Jonathan Drummond as to HOTLEATHERS.COM, INC.. (Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 service Summons issued Tue 01/28 4:29 PM
SUMMONS issued as to HOTLEATHERS.COM, INC. (EVK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 01/27 11:35 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Jonathan Drummond. (Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 01/27 11:34 PM
NOTICE of a related action (Amended) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jonathan Drummond. Related case(s): No (Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/27 2:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Jonathan Drummond against HOTLEATHERS.COM, INC. filed by Jonathan Drummond. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Jonathan Drummond.(Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Fri 01/24 5:17 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Jonathan Drummond.(Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Answers to Court Interrogatories and Attachments
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 01/24 1:41 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Jonathan Drummond. (Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 01/24 1:40 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jonathan Drummond. Related case(s): No (Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 11:36 AM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/10/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Fri 01/10 11:35 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/10/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Fri 01/10 11:19 AM
SUMMONS issued as to SHAF International, Inc. (MSN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/09 4:07 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:25-cv-34-PGB-LHP. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT Jonathan Drummond against SHAF INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a HOT LEATHERS (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22894852) filed by JONATHAN DRUMMOND.(Kravets, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons