California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:25-cv-00237
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 2:22 AM PST
Defendant
Magnolia Equity Group LLC
Defendant
Oaxaca Mia Mexican Traditional Clothes
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Miriam Maldonado
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
25 25 notice Settlement Fri 05/02 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Miriam Maldonado. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/15 11:33 AM
TEXT-ENTRY ONLY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: Judge Wu hears civil matters on Monday or Thursday at 8:30 a.m. For that reason DEFENDANT MAGNOLIA EQUITY GROUP, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT19 previously scheduled for May 30, 2025 is CONTINUED to June 2, 2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
23 23 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 1:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Magnolia Equity Group LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT19 served on 4/11/25. (aco)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 1:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Magnolia Equity Group LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT19 served on 4/11/25. (aco)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 1:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Magnolia Equity Group LLC, re DECLARATION OF MELVIN BURRELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MAGNOLIA EQUITY GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT20 served on 4/11/25. (aco)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 04/14 1:07 PM
DECLARATION OF MELVIN BURRELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MAGNOLIA EQUITY GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT19 filed by Defendant Magnolia Equity Group LLC. (aco)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Case Mon 04/14 1:05 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Magnolia Equity Group LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/30/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge George H Wu. (aco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 11:28 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H Wu. On April 9, 2025, Plaintiff Miriam Maldonado filed a Notice of Settlement17 . The Court vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 30 days. The Court sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for May 15, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on May 13, 2025. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 notice Settlement Wed 04/09 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Miriam Maldonado. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/08 11:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for Thursday, April 10, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. The Court recommends counsel use a landline without the use of the speakerphone when appearing by telephone due to sound reception. If a cellular phone is used and it causes interference or interruptions, the Court will stop the proceeding and require counsel to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/03 4:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miriam Maldonado, upon Defendant Magnolia Equity Group LLC served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MELVIN BURRELL, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 04/03 12:06 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-2 days, filed by Plaintiff Miriam Maldonado.. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 03/07 11:11 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 10, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 3, 2025. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/06 10:20 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Oaxaca Mia Mexican Traditional Clothes. (aco)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/06 10:18 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Oaxaca Mia Mexican Traditional Clothes.(aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 02/24 4:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miriam Maldonado, upon Defendant Oaxaca Mia Mexican Traditional Clothes served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Veronica Vargas, Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
9 9 10 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 10:31 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/13 11:48 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Magnolia Equity Group LLC, Oaxaca Mia Mexican Traditional Clothes. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 01/13 11:46 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 01/13 11:46 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 01/13 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 1:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Maldonado Miriam. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 01/09 1:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 01/09 1:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maldonado Miriam. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/09 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38883414 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Maldonado Miriam. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Maldonado Miriam(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]