California Central District Court
Judge:Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-00245
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 2:24 AM PST
Defendant
Acton Auto Parts, Inc
Defendant
Gary Leigh Lancaster
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Moises Villalobos
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 02/24 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Wed 01/29 7:49 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (san)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/09 4:28 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Acton Auto Parts, Inc, Gary Leigh Lancaster. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Thu 01/09 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 2:36 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 01/09 2:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 01/09 2:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/09 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38884210 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Moises Villalobos(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]