California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:25-cv-00247
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 2:24 AM PST
Defendant
Imran Javed
Defendant
Tilak Karki
Defendant
LA Candy and Supplies, Inc.
Defendant
Organic Strength LLC
Defendant
Seven Skies, Inc.
Defendant
Syed Hassan A. Shah
Plaintiff
FTLS Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Elodie Marie Bardon
Hankin Patent Law, Apc
contact info
Marc E Hankin
Hankin Patent Law Apc
contact info
Moish E. Peltz
Falcon Rappaport And Berkman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thang Botanicals, Inc.
Represented By
Elodie Marie Bardon
Hankin Patent Law, Apc
contact info
Marc E Hankin
Hankin Patent Law Apc
contact info
Moish E. Peltz
Falcon Rappaport And Berkman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
43 43 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/22 8:56 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On April 11, 2025, the Court issued an Order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution39 . On April 14, 2025, Plaintiff filed a Request for Clerk to Enter Default40 . Default was subsequently entered42 . In light of this responsive filing, the Court hereby orders the OSC discharged. The court DIRECTS Plaintiff(s) to file a motion for default judgment on or before *May 15, 2025*. Failure to file a motion for default judgment or seek other appropriate relief by the courts deadline may result in dismissal without further order or notice from the court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); Link v. Wabash R.R. Co., 370 U.S. 626, 629 (1962) (The authority of a federal trial court to dismiss a plaintiffs action with prejudice because of his failure to prosecute cannot seriously be doubted.); Hells Canyon Pres. Council v. U.S. Forest Serv., 403 F.3d 683, 689 (9th Cir. 2005) ([C]ourts may dismiss under Rule 41(b) sua sponte, at least under certain circumstances.); Ash v. Cvetkov, 739 F.2d 493, 496 (9th Cir. 1984) (It is within the inherent power of the court to sua sponte dismiss a case for lack of prosecution.). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
42 42 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 04/18 6:08 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendants Imran Jave, LA Candy and Supplies, Inc., Organic Strength LLC, Seven Skies, Inc., Syed Hassan A. Shah. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
41 41 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 8:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., re REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Imran Javed, LA Candy and Supplies, Inc., Organic Strength LLC, Seven Skies, Inc., Syed Hassan A. Shah40 served on 4/14/2025. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 04/14 4:06 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Imran Javed, LA Candy and Supplies, Inc., Organic Strength LLC, Seven Skies, Inc., Syed Hassan A. Shah filed by Plaintiffs FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc.. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marc E. Hankin,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, April 11, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/14 2:32 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Serena R. Murillo: The court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than 4/15/2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to file a timely and appropriate response to this Order may result in dismissal without further notice or order from the court. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
38 38 order Default Judgment Wed 04/09 3:47 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Application for Entry of Default Judgment By The Court33 by Judge Serena R. Murillo: As of this date, the clerk has not entered default against the above identified defendants. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' application for default judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Dkt. 33.) See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
37 37 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/08 8:01 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Serena R. Murillo: The Court, on its own motion, hereby RESETS the hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment33 to Thursday, July 3, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 9B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 411 West 4th Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
36 36 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 03/26 4:49 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., regarding Document Dkt. No. 35 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo served on 3/26/2025. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/26 9:35 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
34 34 misc Status Report Mon 03/17 5:10 PM
STATUS REPORT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AS ORDERED BY THE COURT IN THE REASSIGNMENT ORDER DKT. 31 filed by Plaintiffs Thang Botanicals, Inc., FTLS Holdings, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Default Judgment Mon 03/17 11:07 AM
APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Seven Skies Inc., LA Candy And Supplies, Inc., Organic Strength LLC, Imran Javed, Syed Hassan A. Shah filed by Plaintiffs Thang Botanicals, Inc., FTLS Holdings, LLC. Application set for hearing on 4/17/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Serena R. Murillo. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Marc E. Hankin,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
32 32 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Fri 03/14 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Tilak Karki. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 11:46 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
30 30 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Thu 02/27 1:00 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-040) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Serena R. Murillo, this case is transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to the calendar of Judge Serena R. Murillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-00247 SRM(JCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
29 29 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/18 4:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., upon Defendant LA Candy and Supplies, Inc. served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yasmin Sharif - Employee - Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
28 28 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/05 3:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., upon Defendant Imran Javed served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yasmin Sharif - Wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/05 3:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., upon Defendant Organic Strength LLC served on 2/2/2025, answer due 2/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adi Nevarez - Buisness Development Manager - Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/05 2:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., upon Defendant Syed Hassan A. Shah served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aimun Sha - Co Resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 02/05 2:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff FTLS Holdings, LLC, Thang Botanicals, Inc., upon Defendant Seven Skies, Inc. served on 2/2/2025, answer due 2/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adi Nevarez - Business Development Manager - Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
24 24 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 10:29 PM
21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Imran Javed. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
23 23 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/22 10:28 PM
ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Moish E. Peltz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Thang Botanicals, Inc. and FTLS Holdings, LLC, designating Marc E. Hankin as local counsel21 . (gk)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Summons Request Wed 01/22 1:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Thang Botanicals, Inc., FTLS Holdings, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 01/21 4:10 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Moish E. Peltz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Thang Botanicals, Inc., FTLS Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38946237) filed by Plaintiffs Thang Botanicals, Inc., FTLS Holdings, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing - New York,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 01/14 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Moish E. Peltz on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/14 10:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Tilak Karki. (et)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/14 9:45 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Syed Hassan A. Shah. (et)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/14 9:43 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Organic Strength LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/14 9:41 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant LA Candy and Supplies, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/14 9:40 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Seven Skies, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 01/14 9:38 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 01/14 9:09 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/14 9:09 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/14 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
10 10 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:01 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Thu 01/09 2:59 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 01/09 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC, identifying THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC, SEVEN SKIES INC., LA CANDY AND SUPPLIES, INC., ORGANIC STRENGTH LLC, IMRAN JAVED, SYED HASSAN A. SHAH, TILAK KARKI. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 01/09 2:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs THANG BOTANICALS, INC., FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/09 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38884317 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC, THANG BOTANICALS, INC.. (Attorney Marc E Hankin added to party THANG BOTANICALS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Marc E Hankin added to party FTLS HOLDINGS, LLC(pty:pla))(Hankin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A