Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:25-cv-00029
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Case in other court:4th J.D. for the Parish of Ouachita, C-20244262
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 3:58 AM CST
Defendant
Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co
Represented By
Kelly Dunleath Simpkins
Wells Marble & Hurst
contact info
Michael David Anderson
Wells Marble & Hurst (rl)
contact info
Plaintiff
Zoraida Salinas-Gonzalez
Represented By
Charles W Herold, III
Law Office Of Charles W Herold Iii
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 2:11 PM
(Affirmative Defenses) and ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co.(aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/08 9:04 AM
AMENDED STATE COURT PETITION against Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co filed by Zoraida Salinas-Gonzalez.(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 04/04 11:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Motion to Amend/Correct, and the amended pleading is to be filed in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/4/2025. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Tue 04/01 3:55 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct State Court Petition by Zoraida Salinas-Gonzalez. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/1/2025.(aty,Herold, Charles) Modified docket text on 4/1/2025 (Chavis, J). Modified docket entry linkage on 4/1/2025 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order,
Att: 2 Proposed pleading
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order - Doughty/McClusky Mon 03/10 1:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 3/2/2026 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, Courtroom 2 before Judge Terry A Doughty. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2026 at 11:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2026. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/9/2025. Witness List due by 7/9/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/9/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/11/2025. Discovery deadline 9/16/2025. Expert Depositions due by 10/16/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2025. Daubert Motions due by 10/31/2025. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/6/2026. Motions in Limine due by 1/5/2026. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 2/20/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/10/2025. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
15 15 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Sun 03/09 7:50 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/9/2025. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 03/07 4:35 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by All Parties . (aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 misc Response to Removal Order Tue 02/11 6:41 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co .(aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Copy of Notice to State Court Clerk of Notice of Removal
12 12 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included) Tue 02/11 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 order Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James Mon 02/10 3:05 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/3/2025.Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/10/2025. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/28 10:32 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kelly Dunleath Simpkins for Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/28/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 misc Corrective Document Thu 01/23 4:14 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT filed by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co regarding7 MOTION for Kelly D. Simpkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6168130),8 Notice of Deficiency, . (aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 10:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION for Kelly D. Simpkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6168130). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/23/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 01/21 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Michael David Anderson on behalf of Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co regarding7 MOTION for Kelly D. Simpkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6168130). Reason: The above item requires a certificate of good standing within the last 6 months. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/21 2:33 PM
DEFICIENT ? MOTION for Kelly D. Simpkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6168130) by Mutual of Omaha Insurance . Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/21/2025.(aty,Anderson, Michael) Modified to indicate deficiency on 1/21/2025 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Proposed order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 3:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint in State Court Record at [Doc. 1-2; pgs. 5-11] by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co.(aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
5 5 order Removal Order Mon 01/13 2:12 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/13/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Fri 01/10 2:26 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/10/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/09 4:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. (aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Thu 01/09 4:29 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. (aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 01/09 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number C-20244262 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6158436) filed by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company.(Attorney Michael David Anderson added to party Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - All State Process, Pleadings, and Orders Served on Defendant
service State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases) Fri 01/10 2:18 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Co answer due 1/16/2025. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/10 2:20 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]