Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:25-cv-00107
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 4:01 AM CST
Defendant
Rockler Companies Inc.
Represented By
Lisa Lamm Bachman
Foley & Mansfield, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarence Frost
Represented By
Chad Throndset
Throndset Michenfelder, LLC
contact info
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Frost
Represented By
Chad Throndset
Throndset Michenfelder, LLC
contact info
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/06 3:18 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rockler Companies Inc. answer due 4/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/6/2025. (JLB)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Thu 03/06 11:02 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost.(Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/06 11:01 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 01/31 8:13 AM
ORDER on6 Stipulation. Rockler Companies Inc. answer due 3/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/31/2025.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 01/30 2:43 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Stipulation. (Bachman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 01/30 2:41 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Rockler Companies Inc.. Jointly Signed by Clarence Frost and Tammy Frost. (Bachman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/30 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lamm Bachman on behalf of Rockler Companies Inc.. (Bachman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/14 1:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Rockler Companies Inc. served on 1/14/2025, answer due 2/4/2025. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 11:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Rockler Companies Inc.. (ACH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 01/10 11:09 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 25-cv-107 PJS/LIB. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Rockler Companies Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11590211) filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Filer requests summons issued. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet