New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:25-cv-00230
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
NATCO PHARMA LIMITED
Represented By
JAMES S. RICHTER
Midlige Richter LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ASTRAZENECA AB
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
NATCO PHARMA INC.
Terminated: 01/23/2025
Represented By
JAMES S. RICHTER
Midlige Richter LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 04/15 5:09 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH.(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
15 15 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 03/13 11:14 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 03/13 2:49 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, and MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/15/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 03/11 7:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATCO PHARMA LIMITED. (RICHTER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 03/11 7:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , Separate Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH by NATCO PHARMA LIMITED.(RICHTER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 01/23 11:26 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to NATCO PHARMA INC., without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 1/23/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Wed 01/22 7:08 PM
Letter from Defendants to the Honorable Robert Kirsch, USDJ re Dismissal of Natco Pharma Inc..(RICHTER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of NATCO PHARMA LIMITED, NATCO PHARMA INC. (RICHTER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/16 6:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH. NATCO PHARMA LIMITED waiver sent on 1/10/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 10:54 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NATCO PHARMA INC., NATCO PHARMA LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Fri 01/10 10:38 AM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dmr3) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/10/2025) (dmr3, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/09 5:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH identifying Merck & Co., Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/09 5:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/09 5:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA AB identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/09 5:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/09 5:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT against NATCO PHARMA INC., NATCO PHARMA LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15928414) , Related Case Selected , filed by KUDOS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, MSD INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS GMBH.(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certification (Rule 11.2),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/10 10:53 AM
Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]