New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:25-bk-40119
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Beaux Equities LLC
5409 18th Ave
Brooklyn, NY 11204-1928
Represented By
Avrum J Rosen
Law Offices Of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
41 41 answer Memorandum of Law in Support Fri 05/09 2:26 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust Related [+] (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 39 Motion for Remand filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Creditor Shorivger Trust
40 40 answer Affirmation in Support Fri 05/09 2:22 PM
Affirmation in Support Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
39 39 motion Remand Fri 05/09 1:53 PM
First Motion for Remand Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
38 38 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 04/21 12:59 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2025 Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 04/21 12:57 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2025 (Amended) Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
36 36 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Thu 04/10 9:43 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 34 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
35 35 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Thu 04/10 9:38 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 33 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
34 34 27 pgs motion Employ (Application) Thu 04/10 9:26 AM
Application to Employ David Goldwasser as Chief Restructuring Officer for the Debtor . Objections to be filed on 5/2/25. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: 6/4/25 at 10:30a.m.. Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC. Order to be presented for signature on 5/9/2025. (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
33 33 16 pgs motion Employ (Application) Thu 04/10 9:24 AM
Application to Employ Rosen, Tsionis & Pizzo PLLC as Debtor's Counsel . Objections to be filed on 5/2/25. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: 6/4/25 at 10:30a.m.. Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC. Order to be presented for signature on 5/9/2025. (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
32 32 plan Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Wed 04/09 4:12 PM
Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V dated April 9, 2025. Percentage to be paid to General Unsecured Creditors unknown. Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+]. (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
31 31 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 4:09 PM
Adversary case 1 25-01037 Complaint by Powercap Partners LLC against Beaux Equities LLC, Yaakov Pollak, Moshe Pollak, Shorivger Trust, Raphael Grossman as Trustee of the Shorivger Trust. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)). (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint
Att: 3 Beaux/Yaakov/Moshe Answer, Counterclaims, and Cross-Claims
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Shorivger/Raphael Answer to Cross-Claims
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Shorivger/Raphael Answer to Complaint + Counter-Claims and Cross-Claims
Att: 6 Exh D - continued
Att: 7 Exhibit D - continued
Att: 8 Exhibit D - continued
Att: 9 Exhibit D - continued
Att: 10 Exhibit D - continued
Att: 11 Exhibit D - continued
Att: 12 Exh E - Beaux/Yaakov/Moshe Reply to Cross-Claims
Att: 13 Exh F - Powercap Answer to Counter-Claims of Beaux/Yaakov/Moshe Counter-Claimants
Att: 14 Exh G - Powercap Answer to Shorivger/Raphael Counter-Claimants
Att: 15 Exh H - State Court Docket Index No. 524411/2017
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 04/04 11:50 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust Related [+] (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust,24 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Creditor Shorivger Trust, Motion for Relief From Stay
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
29 29 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Wed 03/26 10:33 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2025 Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Wed 03/26 10:32 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2025 Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 03/28 8:38 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Gerard R Luckman Sub Chapter V Trustee, Lawrence Richard Kulak Representing 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Avrum J Rosen Representing Debtor, Shannon Scott from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 05/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 10 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Fri 03/28 8:39 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Gerard R Luckman Sub Chapter V Trustee, Lawrence Richard Kulak Representing 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Avrum J Rosen Representing Debtor, Shannon Scott from the Office of the United States Trustee - Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 24 First Motion to Dismiss Case; Motion for Relief from Stay Re: 5405 18th Avenue, Brooklyn, NY; 5409 18th Avenue, Brooklyn, NY; 5411 18th Avenue, Brooklyn, NY Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust.
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 answer Reply Fri 03/21 3:56 PM
Reply Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust Related [+] (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust,24 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Creditor Shorivger Trust, Motion for Relief From Stay
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
26 26 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Wed 03/19 3:58 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 25 Objection filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
25 25 answer Objection Wed 03/19 12:48 PM
Objection to Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively for Relief from Stay Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust,24 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Creditor Shorivger Trust, Motion for Relief From Stay
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit B (continued)
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Att: 10 Exhibit I
Att: 11 Exhibit J
Friday, March 07, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss Case Fri 03/07 1:02 PM
First Motion to Dismiss Case ; Motion for Relief from Stay Re: 5405 18th Avenue, Brooklyn, NY; 5409 18th Avenue, Brooklyn, NY; 5411 18th Avenue, Brooklyn, NY . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Shorivger Trust. (Kulak, Lawrence) Modified on 3/7/2025 added property addresses (jag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Affidavit
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 03/07 1:06 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:1 25-40119 jmm] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23413414. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#24
court Hearing Sched/Resched (Document) Fri 03/07 3:26 PM
Hearing Scheduled, Rescheduled;Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (ylr)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Creditor Shorivger Trust
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK) Sun 03/09 10:07 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Gerard R Luckman Sub Chapter V Trustee, Avrum J Rosen Representing Debtor, Slyvia Shweder from the Office of the United States Trustee. - Related [+] - Marked Off / Amended Order filed (tml)
Related: [-] 8 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Sun 03/09 10:10 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Gerard R Luckman SubChpater V Trustee, Lawrence Richard Kulak Representing 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust, Avrum J Rosen Representing Debtor, Sylvia Shweder from the Office of the United States Trustee, David Goldwasser- Status hearing to be held on 03/26/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 10 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 motion Dismiss Case Mon 03/03 5:35 PM
First Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust. (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Affidavit
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Att: 4 Exhibit B
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Att: 6 Exhibit D
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Att: 8 Exhibit F
Att: 9 Exhibit G
Att: 10 Exhibit H
Att: 11 Exhibit I
Att: 12 Affidavit
Att: 13 Exhibit A
Att: 14 Exhibit B
Att: 15 Exhibit C-1
Att: 16 Exhibit C-2
Att: 17 Exhibit D
Att: 18 Exhibit E
Att: 19 Exhibit F
Att: 20 Affidavit Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
22 22 misc Statement Wed 02/26 10:22 AM
Statement /Corporate Resolution Regarding CRO Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2 Statement filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
Friday, February 21, 2025
21 21 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 5:05 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 19 Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
Thursday, February 20, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/20 2:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of Shorivger Trust (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 misc Pre-Status Conference Report Wed 02/19 6:31 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
18 18 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 5:49 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 17 Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim
Thursday, February 13, 2025
17 17 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Fri 02/14 10:01 AM
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof. Ordered, that except as otherwise provided herein, all persons and entities, that assert a claim, as defined in section 101(5) of 11 U.S.C. §§ 101 et seq. against the Debtor which arose prior to the filing of the Chapter 11 petition on January 9, 2025, shall file a proof of such claim in writing so that it is received on or before April 2, 2025. Ordered, that notwithstanding any other provision hereof, proofs of claim filed by governmental units must be filed on or before July 8, 2025. Ordered, that the Debtor shall file proof of service of the notice of the Bar Date on or before February 25, 2025. Related document(s)14 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC. Signed on 2/13/2025 (ylr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/12 6:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lawrence Richard Kulak on behalf of 5405-5411 18th Avenue Trust (Kulak, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Wed 02/12 11:45 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Gerard R Luckman Sub Chapter V Trustee, Avrum J Rosen Representing Debtor, Nazar Khodorovsky from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 03/05/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 8 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 02/10 1:44 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Affidavit Pursuant to EDNY LBR 1009-1 Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Related [+] (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-] 12 Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due) filed by Debtor Beaux Equities LLC
14 14 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Mon 02/10 11:59 AM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC. (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh A - Proposed Notice
Att: 2 Proposed Order
trustee Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Mon 02/10 8:37 AM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 2/18/2025 at 12:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Martin, MaryLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
13 13 misc Statement Fri 02/07 4:50 PM
Statement /Declaration Pursuant to EDNY LBR 1007-4 Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh A
12 12 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due) Fri 02/07 4:45 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement LBR 1073-2(b), Statement LBR 2017, Affidavit LBR 1007-1(b), Affidavit LBR 1009-1(a) Fee Amount $34 Filed by Daniel LeBrun on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (LeBrun, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 Largest Unsecured Creditor List
Att: 2 SoFA
Att: 3 Form 2030 Attorney Compensation
Att: 4 Equity Holders List
Att: 5 Amended Verification of Creditor Matrix
Att: 6 EDNY LBR Forms
Att: 7 Affidavit Pursuant to LBR 1007-1(b)
Att: 8 Affidavit Pursuant to LBR 1009-1(a)
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 02/07 5:31 PM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)([LINK:1 25-40119 jmm] ) [misc,schsfa] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23333949. Fee amount 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#12
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Fri 02/07 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 02/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Tue 02/04 4:24 PM
Amended Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference and 11 U.S.C. § 1188 Status Conference. Ordered, that pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(a), an initial case conference will be held before the Honorable Jil Mazer-Marino of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Courtroom 3529, Brooklyn, New York 11201 on February 12, 2025, at 11:00 a.m.. Ordered, that pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §1188(a), a status conference will be held before the Honorable Jil Mazer-Marino of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Courtroom 3529, Brooklyn, New York 11201 on March 5, 2025, at 11:00 a.m.. Ordered, that the initial case conference and the 1188 Status Conference may be held in person, by phone, or by videoconference. that pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §1188(c), not later than 14 days before the 1188 Status Conference, the Debtor shall file with the Court and serve on the subchapter V trustee and all parties in interest, a report that details the efforts the Debtor has undertaken and will undertake to attain a consensual plan of reorganization. Related [+]Signed on 2/3/2025 (ylr)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Sunday, January 19, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 01/20 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 01/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 01/17 4:56 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Ordered, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(d), that a Case Management Conference will be held in person, by telephone or by videoconference by the undersigned Bankruptcy Judge on February12, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (ylr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 01/17 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Mon 01/13 4:20 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/10/2025 at 12:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 0 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Mon 01/13 4:08 PM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Gerard R Luckman, Esq . Gerard R Luckman, Esq. added to the case. at Filed by Office of the United States Trustee.(Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement
Sunday, January 12, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Mon 01/13 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 01/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Fri 01/10 4:45 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 1/9/2025.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 1/9/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 1/9/2025. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 1/16/2025. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 1/16/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 1/16/2025. Subchapter V Tax Return due by 1/16/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 1/23/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 1/23/2025. Schedule A/B due 1/23/2025. Schedule D due 1/23/2025. Schedule E/F due 1/23/2025. Schedule G due 1/23/2025. Schedule H due 1/23/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 1/23/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/23/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 1/23/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 1/23/2025. (ylr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement Thu 01/09 1:42 PM
Statement /Corporate Resolution Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC (Rosen, Avrum)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 01/09 1:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of Beaux Equities LLC Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 04/9/2025. (Rosen, Avrum)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 01/09 1:40 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 25-40119 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23249817. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1