California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-00252
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 2:25 AM PST
Defendant
Crown Coachworks, Inc.
Represented By
Steven R Belilove
Kaufman Dolowich LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Dunkel
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Clifton Walker
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/24 12:13 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 02/24 10:02 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants, Crown Coachworks, Inc. and Jacob Dunkel, As Trustee of the Dunkel Family Trust All Defendants, identifying Plaintiff, Clifton Walker. (Attorney Steven R Belilove added to party DOES(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R Belilove added to party Jacob Dunkel(pty:dft))(Belilove, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/21 5:36 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Crown Coachworks, Inc.. (Belilove, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/21 5:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Crown Coachworks, Inc. Crown Coachworks, Inc..(Attorney Steven R Belilove added to party Crown Coachworks, Inc.(pty:dft))(Belilove, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/04 3:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Dunkel, upon Defendant Jacob Dunkel served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JACOB DUNKEL, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/04 3:11 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker, upon Defendant Crown Coachworks, Inc. served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JACOB DUNKEL, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 01/27 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel must refer to the Central District's website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov for Judge Dean D. Pregerson's Procedures and Schedules. Counsel must review the Court's Standing Order and CV Trial Order, and comply with the same. See minute order for details. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/15 11:28 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Crown Coachworks, Inc. and Jacob Dunkel. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 01/14 4:26 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/14 4:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/14 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 01/09 3:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 01/09 3:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 01/09 3:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/09 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38884814 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Clifton Walker(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]