Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:25-cv-00018
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 answer Response to habeas petition Tue 03/25 2:34 PM
RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Warden, FCC Coleman - Low.(Aycock, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of substitution of AUSA Tue 03/18 11:56 AM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. John Aycock substituting for Roberta J. Bodnar. (Aycock, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Fri 02/07 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roberta J. Bodnar on behalf of Warden, FCC Coleman - Low (Bodnar, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/04 3:52 PM
ORDER denying 2 Motion for Judicial Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/4/2025. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order to respond to habeas petition Thu 01/30 3:39 PM
ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/30/2025.(KLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition
Thursday, January 16, 2025
misc Fees Paid Thu 01/16 1:40 PM
FEES Paid by Jamey A. Murphy (Filing fee $5.00, Receipt Number OCA-13820). (RLK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
3 3 order Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants Thu 01/09 3:08 PM
STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/9/2025. (MGB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/09 3:02 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically, "Judicial Relief " by Jamey A. Murphy.(MGB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 01/09 2:55 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Jamey A. Murphy. (No fees paid, no service copies provided)(MGB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope