Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00003
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 10, 2025 2:18 AM EST
Defendant
Brad Kenneth Spafford (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Swartz
Swartz, Taliaferro, Swartz & Goodove, P.C.
contact info
Lawrence Hunter Woodward, Jr.
Ruloff Swain Haddad Morecock Talbert & Woodward, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Emily Rebecca Gantt
United States Attorney'S Office - Norfolk
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/10/2025 3:08 AM EST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal Complaint by USA as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Complaint as to Brad Kenneth Spafford (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/10/2024. (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Brad Kenneth Spafford (1). (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
4 4 AFFIDAVIT by USA in support of3 Criminal Complaint as to Brad Kenneth Spafford (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
Set Hearings as to Brad Kenneth Spafford: Initial Appearance set for 12/18/2024 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (lwoo) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Brad Kenneth Spafford (mrees) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey A. Swartz appearing for Brad Kenneth Spafford (Swartz, Jeffrey) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: Initial Appearance as to Brad Kenneth Spafford held. Defendant advised of rights, charges and right to counsel. Detention Hearing set for 12/23/2024 at 12:00 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. Preliminary Hearing set for 1/3/2025 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Appearances: Defendant present in custody; AUSA Matt Heck for Government; Defense Counsel Jeffrey Swartz for Defendant (Court Reporter FTR.)(bwell) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brad Kenneth Spafford (bwell) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/18/24. (bwell) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
11 11 Temporary Detention Order as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/18/24. (bwell) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
Reset Hearings as to Brad Kenneth Spafford: Preliminary Hearing reset for 12/30/2024 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lawrence Hunter Woodward, Jr appearing for Brad Kenneth Spafford (Woodward, Lawrence) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/17/2024 in case as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. (Pittman, Melanie) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Detention Hearing as to Brad Kenneth Spafford held on 12/23/202., Appearances : AUSA Rebecca Gantt for the Government, retained attorney Lawrence Woodward for defendan. Defendant is present in custody. Defendant waived immediate detention and requested that the hearing be set along with the preliminary hearing currently set for 12/30/24 at 11:30 am. GRANTED. Court will issue an order and matter to be reset. Reset Hearings as to Brad Kenneth Spafford: Detention Hearing set for 12/30/2024 at 11:30 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Defendant remanded to USM custody pending further proceedings.(Tape #FTR - Mag. Two.)(cdod, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/23/2024. (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
Reset Hearings as to Brad Kenneth Spafford: Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 12/30/2024 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Brad Kenneth Spafford held on 12/30/2024 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Defendant present, in custody. Preliminary hearing held. Evidence and witness presented. The Court finds probable cause. Detention hearing held. Proffer and argument of counsel heard. Govt motion for detention DENIED. Defendant to be released on $25,000 U/S bond with special conditions. Govt appeal to be filed by COB today and the matter of bond will be Stayed. Defendant remanded to USM., Appearances : AUSA Rebecca Gantt for the Government, retained attorney Lawrence Woodward, Jeffrey Swartz for defendant.(Court Reporter FTR-Mag 2.)(lwoo) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Govt Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Govt Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Govt Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Govt Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Govt Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Govt Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Govt Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Defendant's Exhibit 1,
Att: 9 SEALED Defendant's Exhibit 2
18 18 MOTION to Revoke Order of Release by USA as to Brad Kenneth Spafford.(Gantt, Emily) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
19 19 MOTION to Stay Order of Release . (Gantt, Emily) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER granting19 Motion to Stay as to Brad Kenneth Spafford (1). This Court's Order of Release is hereby STAYED until close of business Monday, December 30, 2024, pending the Government's filing of a motion for revocation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/30/2024. (alet, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
21 21 RESPONSE to Motion by Brad Kenneth Spafford re18 MOTION to Revoke Order of Release (Swartz, Jeffrey) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
22 22 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12 30-2024 before Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Court reporter/transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/3/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2025.(stewart, jody) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
23 23 Supplemental MOTION to Revoke Release Order by USA as to Brad Kenneth Spafford.(Gantt, Emily) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript
24 24 ORDER as to Brad Kenneth Spafford. The Government's18 Motion for Revocation of Release Order is GRANTED. The previously entered order of December 30, 2024 (ECF No.17 ) is VACATED insofar as it ordered Defendant's release, and the Defendant shall be detained pending trial. The Government's23 Supplemental Motion is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 1/7/2025. Copies distributed as directed. (jhie, ) [2:24-mj-00211]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
Set Hearings as to Brad Kenneth Spafford: Arraignment set for 1/16/2025 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (mrees)
Related: [-]
25 25 INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Brad Kenneth Spafford (1) count(s) 1, 2. On motion of the Government, the Court directed that an arraignment to be set for 1/16/25 at 2:30pm. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Deft Info Sheet