California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-70021
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 11:14 PM PST
Defendant
Yoni Cruz (1)
Represented By
Taylor R. Fatherree
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin Yeh
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2025 11:59 PM PST
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Yoni Cruz Initial Appearance set for 1/8/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Interpreter Needed in case as to Yoni Cruz (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yoni Cruz (1). (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penalty Sheet
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Yoni Cruz held on 1/8/2025; remanded to custody. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Samantha Jaffe appearing. Added attorney Taylor R. Fatherree for Yoni Cruz. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 1/10/2025 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Status Conference set for 1/10/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Recording Time 11:14-11:22. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Yoni Cruz exclude time 1/8/2025-1/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 1/8/2025. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]