Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00006
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 11:14 PM PST
Defendant
Candies Goode-McCoy (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Susan Cushman
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Richard (Tony) Anthony Lopez
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2025 6:40 AM PST
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, as to Candies Goode-McCoy on 1/8/2025. By Deputy Clerk: Summer Rivera. The Court, having received a Criminal Information and Plea Agreement, IT IS ORDERED that the hearing for Waiver of Indictment, Filing of an Information, Initial Appearance and Arraignment and Plea is scheduled on January 21, 2025 at 2:30 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall contact the Pretrial Services Office not later than 24 hours prior to this hearing date if not previously interviewed. Arraignment/Plea set for 1/21/2025 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney John Gerardi Motion for Government Attorney Appearance Under Local Rule IA 11-3 by USA as to Candies Goode-McCoy. (Cushman, Susan)
Related: [-]