Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michelle M Harner
Case #: 1:25-bk-10208
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Plan Confirmed:May 13, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Auto Buffy Inc.
350 Winmeyer Dr Ste B
Odenton, MD 21113-1332
Represented By
Stephen A. Metz
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
For Internal Use Only
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Baltimore
Garmatz Federal Courthouse 101 West Lombard Street Suite 2625
Baltimore, MD 21201


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
52 52 2 pgs order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Tue 05/13 7:25 PM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan , Subchapter V Plan Consensually Pursant to 11 U.S.C. 1191(a) Related [+]. (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-] 48 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Auto Buffy Inc.
51 51 motion Compensation Tue 05/13 11:27 AM
Application for Compensation Under SubChapter V of Chapter 11 for Monique Desiree Almy, Trustee Chapter 11, 1/10/2025 - 5/12/2025, Fee: $7,360.00, Expenses: $.. Notice Served on 5/13/2025 Filed by Monique Desiree Almy. (Almy, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Time Entries
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Att: 3 Notice of Motion
Att: 4 Matrix
Monday, May 12, 2025
court Hearing Set Mon 05/12 9:54 AM
Confirmation Hearing to be conducted virtually Related [+]. Confirmation hearing to be held on 5/12/2025 at 02:00 p.m., by videoconference. Contact Hearings_MMH@mdb.uscourts.gov for Zoom hearing access information. (Komisarek, Anna Marie)
Related: [-] 48 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Auto Buffy Inc.
court Disposition Without Hearing - CDP (Auto-Docket) Mon 05/12 2:32 PM
Evidentiary Hearing Held: re:48 Amended Chapter 11 Plan PLAN IS CONFIRMED Related [+] (Komisarek, Anna Marie)
Related: [-] 48 Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan,48 Amended Chapter 11 Plan
Sunday, May 11, 2025
50 50 2 pgs misc Tally of Ballots Sun 05/11 1:27 PM
Tally of Ballots (Amended) on behalf of Auto Buffy Inc. Filed by Stephen A. Metz. (Metz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 10, 2025
49 49 2 pgs misc Withdrawal of Document Sat 05/10 8:40 PM
Withdrawal of Document on behalf of 1A Auto, Inc. Filed by Richard L. Costella Related [+]. (Costella, Richard)
Related: [-] 42 Objection filed by Creditor 1A Auto, Inc.
48 48 39 pgs plan Amended Chapter 11 Plan Sat 05/10 1:58 PM
Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Auto Buffy Inc. Related [+].(Metz, Stephen)
Related: [-] 27 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V filed by Debtor Auto Buffy Inc.,47 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Auto Buffy Inc.
Att: 1 Redlined Plan (Compared to 5/6/25 Plan)
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
47 47 38 pgs plan Amended Chapter 11 Plan Tue 05/06 1:10 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Auto Buffy Inc. Related [+].(Metz, Stephen)
Related: [-] 27 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V filed by Debtor Auto Buffy Inc.
Att: 1 33 pgs Redlined Plan (Comparing to Initial Plan at Doc. 27)
Att: 2 2 pgs Creditor Matrix