Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:25-ap-50002
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
H.I.G. Capital Management LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation doing business in California
Represented By
Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 1, Director of H.I.G. Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
John Doe 1
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 2, Managing Agent of H.I.G. Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
John Doe 2
contact info
Defendant
Mandy Dawson, an individual
Represented By
Mandy Dawson
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 3, Managing Agent of Jenny Craig, Inc.
Represented By
John Doe 3
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 4, Director of Encina Private Credit SPV, LLC
Represented By
John Doe 4
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 to 50, Inclusive
Represented By
Does 1 to 50
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrienne Arrington
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alecia Guarneros
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexa Sanchez
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alice Scott
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Prescott
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Shepherd
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amsha Swensen
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Torowki
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy White
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Richey
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Annamarie Holmes
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Knutson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Wass
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Becki MacDougall
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bertha Reveles
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bianca Mottola
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Blanca Jaimes
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonnie Dolan
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Breanna Martinez
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carina Tam
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlina Elaine Konopatskiy
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlton Jordan
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol Altemus
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol Cooper
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carolyn Kerrigan
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carrie Bullen Richter
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cathy Poole
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cherrie L Rosander
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cindy Ruiz
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Consuelo Espinoza
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Gersh
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie Mach
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Shelley
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Self
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Egypt Hamby
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elisa Snyder
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elisha Goodman
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roberts M. Elizabeth
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ellizabeth Nu
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ellen Spar
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Matson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Conley
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Evangela Rene Rouzan
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriela Sanchez-Rubio
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ginger Parker
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hailey Jones
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Kaplan
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Iris Claire Slonin
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Janeen Handy
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Mendoza
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Sherman
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Small
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeri Dawn Martel
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Barry-Roderfeld
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Paul Jones
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Vergote
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juanita Angel
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Galovich
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Justine Holden
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Larson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karina Garcia
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Huynh Liu
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Ragusa
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Brechtel
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kim Doyle
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly George
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Greenlee
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Koutris
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Saunders
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauralyn Mazzuca
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa McClure
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorena Gonzalez
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mackenzie Fisher
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Manu Morgado Salyers
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Tafolla
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Guadalupe Flores Depuga
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Allan Mendes
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Kabel Burdick
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Robinson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew C. Brynie
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Switzer
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Melody Valdez
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Ghelfi
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Mantos
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Ropar
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Naghmeh Salenhaghighi
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalie Coconubo-Leiser
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nichol R. Turner
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Anderson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Patton
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Niesha Greenwood
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pam Williams
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Parkhideh Stephanie Malekzadeh
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Walker
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip Cooper
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ranjit R. Chaganti
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raquel Richardson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rekala Ross
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Renae Hodge
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Renee Osborne
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Reyna Farias
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Russell Trimble
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina Pringle
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Serena Olalia
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shafiqa Ansari
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Daugherty
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Gerry
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Goodwin
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon So
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheila Lopez
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheri Wade
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirin T. Jensen
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley Moss
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sreekanth P.
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Starlette Peterson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Sims
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Suelean Smith
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunita Rivankar
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Krakower
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Sopocko
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzanne M. Woodward
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzanne LaSalle
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tal Polany
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tara Grant
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor Bratsch
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Terri Gibson-Hemby
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tori Hobert
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tricia Etue
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vana Pettine
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Venieca Thorson
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Venkata Vijaya Ashok Saripalli
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Virginia Leal
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cathy Moore
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe 5, Managing Agent of Encina Private Credit SPV LLC
Represented By
John Doe 5
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
4 4 notice Completion of Briefing - Notice Thu 02/27 4:13 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Related [+] Filed by Carol Altemus, Nicole Anderson, Juanita Angel, Shafiqa Ansari, Adrienne Arrington, Jessica Barry-Roderfeld, Taylor Bratsch, Kathleen Brechtel, Matthew C. Brynie, Mary Kabel Burdick, Ranjit R. Chaganti, Natalie Coconubo-Leiser, Erica Conley, Carol Cooper, Phillip Cooper, Shannon Daugherty, Bonnie Dolan, Kim Doyle, Roberts M. Elizabeth, Consuelo Espinoza, Tricia Etue, Reyna Farias, Mackenzie Fisher, Julie Galovich, Karina Garcia, Kimberly George, Shannon Gerry, Dawn Gersh, Michelle Ghelfi, Terri Gibson-Hemby, Lorena Gonzalez, Elisha Goodman, Shannon Goodwin, Tara Grant, Kimberly Greenlee, Niesha Greenwood, Maria Guadalupe Flores Depuga, Alecia Guarneros, Egypt Hamby, Janeen Handy, Tori Hobert, Renae Hodge, Justine Holden, Annamarie Holmes, Blanca Jaimes, Shirin T. Jensen, John Doe 5, Hailey Jones, John Paul Jones, Carlton Jordan, Henry Kaplan, Carolyn Kerrigan, Ashley Knutson, Carlina Elaine Konopatskiy, Laura Koutris, Susan Krakower, Suzanne LaSalle, Karen Larson, Virginia Leal, Katherine Huynh Liu, Sheila Lopez, Becki MacDougall, Debbie Mach, Parkhideh Stephanie Malekzadeh, Michelle Mantos, Jeri Dawn Martel, Breanna Martinez, Eric Matson, Lauralyn Mazzuca, Lisa McClure, Mark Allan Mendes, Jennifer Mendoza, Cathy Moore, Shirley Moss, Bianca Mottola, Ellizabeth Nu, Serena Olalia, Renee Osborne, Sreekanth P., Ginger Parker, Nicole Patton, Starlette Peterson, Vana Pettine, Tal Polany, Cathy Poole, Amanda Prescott, Sabrina Pringle, Katherine Ragusa, Bertha Reveles, Raquel Richardson, Andrea Richey, Carrie Bullen Richter, Sunita Rivankar, Mary Robinson, Monica Ropar, Cherrie L Rosander, Rekala Ross, Evangela Rene Rouzan, Cindy Ruiz, Naghmeh Salenhaghighi, Manu Morgado Salyers, Alexa Sanchez, Gabriela Sanchez-Rubio, Laura Saunders, Alice Scott, Diana Self, Denise Shelley, Amanda Shepherd, Jennifer Sherman, Stephanie Sims, Iris Claire Slonin, Jennifer Small, Suelean Smith, Elisa Snyder, Sharon So, Susan Sopocko, Ellen Spar, Amsha Swensen, Matthew Switzer, Marie Tafolla, Carina Tam, Venieca Thorson, Amy Torowki, Russell Trimble, Nichol R. Turner, Melody Valdez, Joshua Vergote, Venkata Vijaya Ashok Saripalli, Sheri Wade, Paula Walker, Barbara Wass, Amy White, Pam Williams, Suzanne M. Woodward (Pereira, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 01/16 4:02 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by H.I.G. Capital Management LLC (Lemon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 misc Affidavit Thu 01/09 2:39 PM
Copy of the complete docket sheet from District Court District of Delaware. Documents may be viewed at www.ded.uscourts.gov Related [+]. (KAR)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Transfer from another District Thu 01/09 2:37 PM
Adversary Transferred from another District District Court of Delaware . (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)). (KAR)
Related: [-]