Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:25-cv-00048
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:24 AM CST
Defendant
Placemakr Hospitality, LLC
211 East Seventh Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Andrew David Bergman
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Placemakr, Inc.
1701 Rhode Island Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036
Represented By
Andrew David Bergman
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PlaceMKR LLC
901 South MoPac Expressway Suite 300
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Richard D. Rivera
Smith, Gambrell, & Russell LLP
contact info
Jason Paul Blair
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
26 26 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/21 10:36 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by PlaceMKR LLC. (Harkins, Jack)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
25 25 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/19 2:20 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc.. (Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/09 5:22 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc., re18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in Part filed by Defendant Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Defendant Placemakr, Inc. (Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Fri 05/09 2:35 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant.Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/23/2025. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 05/09 1:56 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Report by PlaceMKR LLC.(Harkins, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Ex. A Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/30 5:00 PM
Text Order GRANTING21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants file a reply on or before May 9, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 1:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in Part by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc..(Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 4:10 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PlaceMKR LLC, re18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in Part filed by Defendant Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Defendant Placemakr, Inc.(Harkins, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 04/15 1:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney J. Daniel Harkins and Ryan Borelo for Richard D. Rivera by PlaceMKR LLC.(Harkins, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 04/15 2:16 PM
Text Order GRANTING19 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Richard D. Rivera is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that J. Daniel Harkins and Ryan Borelo are substituted as counsel for Plaintiff. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (qtlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
18 18 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 5:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in Part by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc..(Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 03/28 9:51 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PlaceMKR LLC. (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/28 9:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending1 Complaint,., filed by PlaceMKR LLC.(Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/28 10:42 AM
Text Order MOOTING11 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the amended complaint, (Dkt. 16), the motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (qtlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 11:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew T. Salzmann for Placemakr Hospitality, LLC,Matthew T. Salzmann for Placemakr, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 notice Notice Fri 03/21 8:57 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO AMEND COMPLAINT by PlaceMKR LLC (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 3:46 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew David Bergman for Matthew T. Salzmann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19928757) by on behalf of Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc..(Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 03/07 2:33 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc.. (Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 03/07 2:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss in Part by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc..(Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/31 2:51 PM
Text Order GRANTING10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before March 7, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (qtlc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 02/03 1:16 PM
Reset Deadlines: Placemakr Hospitality, LLC answer due 3/7/2025; Placemakr, Inc. answer due 3/7/2025. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/30 2:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc.. (Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/30 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew David Bergman on behalf of Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc.. Attorney Andrew David Bergman added to party Placemakr Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Bergman added to party Placemakr, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bergman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/23 2:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PlaceMKR LLC. Placemakr, Inc. served on 1/15/2025, answer due 2/5/2025. (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/17 9:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PlaceMKR LLC. Placemakr Hospitality, LLC served on 1/15/2025, answer due 2/5/2025. (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 01/13 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Placemakr Hospitality, LLC, Placemakr, Inc.. (kp)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 01/13 11:20 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/10 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Paul Blair on behalf of PlaceMKR LLC. Attorney Jason Paul Blair added to party PlaceMKR LLC(pty:pla) (Blair, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/10 2:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by PlaceMKR LLC. (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/10 2:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by PlaceMKR LLC. (Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/10 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19654274), filed by PlaceMKR LLC.(Rivera, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Screenshots of Website,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Media Attention Example,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - PlaceMakr Registrations and Applications,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Press Release,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Screenshot,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Website Screenshot
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/13 11:44 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 01/13 11:45 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]