Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00006
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
Ft Wayne Indiana City of
Represented By
Michelle K Floyd
Rothberg Logan & Warsco Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Rachel J Guin
Rothberg Logan & Warsco Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Defendant
Trevor Leonard
Defendant
Meijer Inc
Defendant
Zimmerman
Represented By
Michelle K Floyd
Rothberg Logan & Warsco Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Rachel J Guin
Rothberg Logan & Warsco Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Fisher
2230 Stafford, Ste 115, PMB 379
Plainfield, IN 46168
Represented By
Mark R Waterfill
contact info
Plaintiff
R & K Exteriors LLC
Represented By
Mark R Waterfill
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Thu 01/30 3:12 PM
CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re7 Stipulation of Dismissal. (cer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 motion Remand to State Court Wed 01/29 9:28 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Larry Fisher. (Waterfill, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Wed 01/29 4:32 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Larry Fisher. (Waterfill, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Waterfill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Waterfill, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/13 10:50 AM
***NEW CASE*** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (jld)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 5:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF FT. WAYNE, OFFICER ZIMMERMAN.(Guin, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle K Floyd on behalf of CITY OF FT. WAYNE, OFFICER ZIMMERMAN (Floyd, Michelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel J Guin on behalf of CITY OF FT. WAYNE, OFFICER ZIMMERMAN (Guin, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/10 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5785601.) from Marion, Cause No. 49D02-2412-MI-056319, filed by OFFICER ZIMMERMAN, CITY OF FT. WAYNE.(Guin, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Consent
Thursday, December 12, 2024
5 5 cmp State Court Complaint Mon 01/13 10:54 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ft Wayne Indiana City of, Trevor Leonard, Meijer Inc, Zimmerman, filed by Larry Fisher, R & K Exteriors LLC in Marion Superior Court, case number 49D02-2412-MI-56319.(jld) Modified on 1/13/2025 (jld)
Related: [-]