Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:25-cv-00047
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
Erie Retina Research, LLC
Represented By
Patrick O'Keefe Peters
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Marcus L. Mintz
Seyfarth Shaw - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
David R. Almeida
Represented By
Patrick O'Keefe Peters
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Marcus L. Mintz
Seyfarth Shaw - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
Clinical Trials Network, LLC
Represented By
Kyle A. Johnson
Brennan Manna Diamond - Canton
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 04/29 1:37 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendant Erie Retina Research LLC filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 04/29 1:35 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendant, David R. Almeida, M.D. filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
25 25 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 04/22 12:01 PM
Attorney Appearance by Hilary Frances DeSaussure filed by on behalf of Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (DeSaussure, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 answer Answer/Reply to Counterclaim Tue 04/15 3:18 PM
Plaintiff's Reply to19 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Defendant, Erie Retina Research, LLC filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 04/03 9:25 AM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robyn E. Marsh for David R. Almeida, Erie Retina Research, LLC. (Doc.22 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/3/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
23 23 order Protective Order Wed 04/02 3:26 PM
Protective Order . Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/2/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 3:00 PM
Motion for attorney Robyn E. Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-13033529, filed by David R. Almeida, Erie Retina Research, LLC.(Peters, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Robyn E. Marsh's Court Admission re Motion PHV,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Robyn E. Marsh's Certificate of Good Standing for Motion PHV
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
21 21 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Tue 04/01 2:46 PM
Case Management Conference Order: The parties are instructed to read the attached Order in its entirety. Case is assigned to the standard track, and deadlines have been established. Submission of proposed protective order: 4/4/2025 ; amended pleadings/joinder of parties without leave of Court: 6/1/2025 ; non-expert discovery: 10/31/2025 ; expert reports for party bearing the burden of proof: 12/1/2025 ; responsive expert reports: 1/16/2026 ; expert discovery: 2/27/2026 ; and dispositive motions: 12/31/2025. A telephonic status conference is set for 8/14/2025 at 9:00 AM. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conferences. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to the scheduled hearing time. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/1/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Protective Order Tue 04/01 2:39 PM
Stipulated Motion for protective order filed by Plaintiff Clinical Trials Network, LLC.(Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
minutes Case Management Conference Tue 04/01 2:39 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. A telephonic Case Management Conference was held on 4/1/2025. Attorney Kyle Johnson participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Marcus Mintz and Patrick O'Keefe Peters participated on behalf of Defendants. The parties discussed the Rule 26(f) report. A telephonic status conference is set for 8/14/2025 at 9:00 AM. The Court established additional deadlines as stated in the Court's Case Management Order. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 minutes. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/26 6:15 PM
Defendants' First Amended Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)Counterclaim to First Amended Complaint , Counterclaim against Plaintiff/Counter Defendant The Clinical Trials Network, LLC Erie Retina Research, LLC, Clinical Trials Network, LLC filed by Erie Retina Research, LLC, David R. Almeida.(Peters, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit to Defendants' First Amended Answer and Counterclaim to First Amend Complaint
18 18 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 03/26 3:52 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Thu 03/20 2:14 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 4:15 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 4/1/2025 at 11:00 AM . The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to hearing. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 2/27/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Letter from Chief Judge Lioi,
Att: 3 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 4 Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information,
Att: 5 Rule 30.1
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 02/25 3:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Erie Retina Research, LLC. (Peters, Patrick)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 02/25 3:36 PM
Answer to13 Amended complaint,, filed by David R. Almeida, Erie Retina Research, LLC. (Peters, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/12 4:13 PM
First Amended complaint against David R. Almeida, Erie Retina Research, LLC. Filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MDA,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - CTSA,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 12.12.22 Sterling Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 5.19.23 Dr. Almeida Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 7.3.24 Futty Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 10.23.24 Termination Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-10.24.24 Syneos Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 10.29.24 response,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 12.24.24 Response,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - 12.30.24 Reply letter,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Dr. Almeida Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - 1.3.25 reply
Monday, February 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 02/10 9:34 AM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Marcus L. Mintz for David R. Almeida and Erie Retina Research, LLC. (Doc.12 .) Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 2/10/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 8:44 AM
Motion for attorney Marcus L. Mintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12947116, filed by David R. Almeida, Erie Retina Research, LLC.(Peters, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Oath and Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Court Admissions,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 02/06 10:31 AM
Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Erie Retina Research, LLC. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 02/06 8:44 AM
Attorney Appearance by Patrick O'Keefe Peters filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Peters, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Tue 02/04 10:21 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Erie Retina Research, LLC on 1/30/2025. No delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website. Filed on behalf of Clinical Trials Network, LLC. Related document(s)6 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Wed 01/29 12:55 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon David R. Almeida on 1/27/2025, filed on behalf of Clinical Trials Network, LLC. Related document(s)6 . (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 01/27 1:44 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC.(Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons Erie Retina
Friday, January 24, 2025
oth_evt Service by Clerk Fri 01/24 2:45 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Erie Retina Research, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0775 7325 09 (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Service by Clerk Fri 01/24 2:48 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to David R. Almeida placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0874 9054 46. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 01/15 3:41 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon David R. Almeida, Erie Retina Research, LLC. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 01/14 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_doc Praecipe Tue 01/14 4:02 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Clinical Trials Network, LLC.(Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons Erie Retina,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Almeida
Monday, January 13, 2025
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Brennan Mon 01/13 9:20 AM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 1/13/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 01/13 8:03 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons was provided or issued. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 01/13 7:59 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 01/13 8:01 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/10 4:26 PM
Complaint with jury demand against The Clinical Trials Network. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12904959.. Filed by The Clinical Trials Network. (Johnson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - MDA,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - CTSA & First Amendment,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Email 12.12.22 Correspondence,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Email 5.19.24 Correspondence,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Email 7.3.24 Correspondence,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Termination Letter 10.23.24,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - CTNx Response Letter 10.29.24,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Almeida & ERR Response Letter 12.24.24,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - CTNx Reply Letter 12.30.24,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Almeida & ERR Reply 1.3.25