South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 6:25-cv-00195
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 4:42 AM EST
Defendant
STAline Waterworks Inc
Represented By
Henry L Parr, Jr
Wyche, P.A.
contact info
Matthew T Richardson
Wyche Pa (cola)
contact info
Wade S Kolb, III
Wyche Pa (gree)
contact info
Plaintiff
Fortiline Inc
Represented By
Yasmeen Ebbini
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough Llp (cola)
contact info
Debbie Whittle Durban
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough
contact info
Jeremy Cook Hodges
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough LLP
contact info
Don Lawrence Kristinik, III
Nelson Mullins Riley And Scarborough
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 04/17 12:18 PM
OPINION and ORDER granting in part 11 Motion to Stay as set out. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/17/25.(alew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/24 12:26 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by STAline Waterworks Inc.(Kolb, Wade)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 and 18 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Aurora Temple Barnes and Brandon Alexander Fuqua added for plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/14/25.(kmca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Tue 03/11 2:43 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Alexander Fuqua ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-12316579) by Fortiline Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kristinik, Don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission - B Fuqua,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice - B Fuqua
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Tue 03/11 2:29 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aurora Temple Barnes ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-12316459) by Fortiline Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kristinik, Don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission PHV - A. Barnes
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 8 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/25 3:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Stay Response filed by STAline Waterworks Inc. (Kolb, Wade)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 6:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against STAline Waterworks Inc, filed by Fortiline Inc. Service due by 5/27/2025 (Kristinik, Don)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/18 6:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Fortiline Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/25/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Hodges, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Delaware Confidentiality Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
11 11 motion Stay Mon 02/03 5:51 PM
MOTION to Stay by STAline Waterworks Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/18/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Kolb, Wade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Emails with Counsel dated January 17, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Verified Second Amended Complaint in Delaware Action,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - March 19, 2024 Delaware Order Denying Motion for TRO,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - April 17, 2024 Delaware Order Denying TRO,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' First Request for Production in Delaware Action,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - September 5, 2024 Order Denying Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - January 15, 2025 Order Granting Defendants Motion to Bifurcate
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 02/03 4:38 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by STAline Waterworks Inc.(Kolb, Wade)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 4:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by STAline Waterworks Inc.(Kolb, Wade)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wade S Kolb, III on behalf of STAline Waterworks Inc (Kolb, Wade)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Thu 01/23 11:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortiline Inc.(Kristinik, Don)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Service on STAline Waterworks, Inc.
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 misc Entry Deletion Mon 02/03 10:31 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #5 Summons Returned. Reason: re-filed by attorney to correct filer log-in vs signature. Corrected Filing Document Number6 Summons Returned. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 1/17/25. (kmca)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Fri 01/17 5:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortiline Inc. STAline Waterworks Inc served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025.(Ebbini, Yasmeen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Service on STAline Waterworks, Inc. c/o The Registered Agent
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 4:54 PM
Summons Issued as to STAline Waterworks Inc. (alew)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 01/10 4:53 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fortiline Inc.(alew)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/10 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against STAline Waterworks Inc ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12200193.), filed by Fortiline Inc. Service due by 4/10/2025(alew)
Related: [-]