Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:25-cv-00041
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Case in other court:15th JDC, Vermilion Parish, 114853
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 2:37 AM CST
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By
Kaitlyn Elizabeth Bourg
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (thib)
contact info
Mary Katherine Paine Martin
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (laf)
contact info
Plaintiff
Trula Thornton
Represented By
Glynn Shelly Maturin, II
Welborn & Hargett
contact info
Jacob Houston Hargett
Welborn & Hargett
contact info
Jason M Welborn
Welborn & Hargett
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order - Joseph Mon 03/17 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2026 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 6/11/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 6/11/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 7/11/2025. Discovery deadline 8/11/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2025. Daubert Motions due by 9/9/2025. Motions in Limine due by 12/8/2025. Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2025. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 12/31/2025. Trial Depositions due by 12/31/2025. Bench Books due by 1/20/2026. Real Time glossary due by 1/20/2026. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 3/17/2025. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/17 10:52 AM
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2026 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a scheduling order in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 3/17/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 03/17 10:49 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/17/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 order Order Mon 03/10 1:20 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER - Due to a scheduling conflict, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:30 AM is RESET for 3/17/2025 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. The participants will join the teleconference by dialing 1-855-244-8681 and entering access code 2305 119 9722. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 3/10/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Mon 03/10 1:16 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 3/10/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 03/10 2:04 PM
ALERT: Set/Reset Hearings: Please note a change to: Hearing Date. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/17/2025 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 03/03 11:15 AM
Joint RULE 26(f) Report by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Trula Thornton . (aty,Bourg, Kaitlyn) Modified on 3/3/2025 to add filer. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included) Wed 02/05 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Wed 02/05 11:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER cancelling scheduling conference inadvertently set for 11:00 am 3/19/25. 3/19/2025 scheduling conference remains set at 10:30. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 2/5/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Wed 02/05 10:57 AM
(FILED IN ERROR: NOT APPLICABLE TO THIS CASE) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2025 11:00 AM in by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26 Report by 3/5/2025. During the teleconference, the parties should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Court's consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The participants will join the teleconference by dialing 1-855-244-8681 and entering access code 2305 119 9722. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 2/5/2025. (crt,Kallam, M) Modified to reflect filed in error per 11 Electronic Order on 2/5/2025 (Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Wed 02/05 10:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26 Report by 3/5/2025. During the teleconference, the parties should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Court's consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates.The participants will join the teleconference by dialing1-855-244-8681 and entering access code 2305 119 9722. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 2/5/2025. (crt,Kallam, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/05 1:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosures exchanged and Rule 26 Report due by 3/5/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 misc Response to Removal Order Mon 01/27 9:11 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co .(aty,Bourg, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court record
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 2:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(aty,Bourg, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 order Removal Order Tue 01/14 10:12 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 1/14/2025. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
5 5 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 01/13 9:56 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 01/13 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Jason M Welborn on behalf of Trula Thornton. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 1/27/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Fri 01/10 3:34 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Bourg, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/10 3:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Bourg, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 01/10 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC, Vermilion Parish, Case Number 114853 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6159688) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(Attorney Kaitlyn Elizabeth Bourg added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Bourg, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Citation, Petition & Discovery
service State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases) Mon 01/13 9:43 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co answer due 1/17/2025. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/13 9:52 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]