Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Lynn Adelman
Case #: 2:25-cv-00045
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Case in other court:Waukesha County Circuit Court, 2024CV001979
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:53 AM CST
Defendant
United Healthcare Services Inc
Represented By
Kadee J Anderson
Stinson LLP
contact info
Jessica Lynn Knox
Stinson LLP
contact info
Involuntary Plaintiff
ProHealth Waukesha Memorial Hospital
Involuntary Plaintiff
Moreland OB-GYN Associates SC
Plaintiff
Amanda E Ward
Represented By
Andrew Gerritt Frank
Mallery Sc
contact info
Samantha S Bailey
Mallery Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 04/22 10:43 AM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/22/2025. IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to restrict access (ECF No.2 ) is DENIED. Details in order. (cc: all counsel)(amh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/21 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference is scheduled for June 9, 2025 at 10:45 a.m. Central Time. The parties shall call the Courts Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 and use Meeting ID 161 8470 1401 and Passcode 187773 to join the call and may be placed on hold until the Court accesses the call. Parties should call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. Additional details in notice. (cc: all counsel)(amh)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/21 11:08 AM
Docket Annotation:4 Motion to Dismiss terminated as the answer to the amended complaint renders the motion moot. (amh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 04/18 8:23 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint, by United Healthcare Services Inc.(Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/04 1:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Services Inc filed by Amanda E Ward.(Bailey, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 United HealthCare Approved Service Request,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 United HealthCare Denial,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - UnitedHealthcare Hysterectomy Medical Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Amanda Ward Appeal,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 United HealthCare Peer Review Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Medical Expenses
Monday, February 10, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 02/10 11:57 AM
ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/10/2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties be granted an Order to stay the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, to allow the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings with a deadline for the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by March 4, 2025, and to allow the Defendant forty-five (45) days thereafter to answer the amended complaint. (cc: all counsel)(amh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Fri 02/07 1:11 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Amanda E Ward.(Frank, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 11:59 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Amanda E Ward. (Frank, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/29 9:00 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/28 2:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United Healthcare Services Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knox, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 01/17 12:24 PM
DECLARATION of Jane Stalinski(Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summary Plan Description
5 5 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 01/17 12:19 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by United Healthcare Services Inc re4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss Fri 01/17 12:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by United Healthcare Services Inc. (Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 01/10 4:09 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by United Healthcare Services Inc on behalf of UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Seal or Restrict Document Fri 01/10 4:06 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document by United Healthcare Services Inc on behalf of UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/10 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Healthcare Services Inc on behalf of UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2024CV001979 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4858120) This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Anderson, Kadee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Redacted Documents Served on UHC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1- Documents Served on UHC,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-SPD,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 01/10 4:49 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (mew)
Related: [-]