Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-bk-10152
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Iron IQ, Inc.
610 Rood Ave
Grand Junction, CO 81501-2742
Represented By
Keri L. Riley
Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
73 73 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/07 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 72 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
72 72 order Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order Mon 05/05 3:56 PM
Minutes of Proceeding regarding United States Trustee's Objection to Debtor's Designation as a Subchapter V Small Business Debtor and Debtor's response Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/27/2025 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C for42 , . (rp)
Related: [-] 42 Objection
Saturday, May 03, 2025
71 71 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 70 Order to Vacate Hearing
Thursday, May 01, 2025
70 70 order Vacate Hearing Thu 05/01 1:46 PM
Notice of Vacated Hearing Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 42 Objection68 Notice of Preliminary Hearing